Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christ's College Old Boys' Association Incorporated
CC35952
9429042616238
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
October 31

Address for service

Private Bag 4900
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
33 Rolleston Avenue
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

03 364 6862
https://www.facebook.com/Christs-College-Old-Boys-Association-223817384297525/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Christ's College Old Boys Association was formed in 1877 and has over 9000 members. It exists to support the School and its educational goals through the provision of funding for scholarships are prizes as well as undertaking other fundraising and charitable activities. It facilitates ongoing contact between Old Boys and the maintenance of their interest in the School.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Making Grants To Promote The Objects And Interests Of Christ's College

Education / training / research

Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Education Exclusively Related To Christ's College

Children / young people

Christs College

Entity Structure

President, vice president, treasurer and committee members

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 April 2009 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 April 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2024 30/04/2025 11/03/2025 $561,147 $311,087 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2023 30/04/2024 27/03/2024 $257,169 $396,130 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2022 30/04/2023 11/04/2023 $215,898 $814,571 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2021 30/04/2022 1/02/2022 $539,063 $306,164 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2020 30/04/2021 3/04/2021 $408,228 $271,203 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2019 30/04/2020 6/04/2020 $531,809 $224,287 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2018 30/04/2019 8/04/2019 $327,782 $240,321 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2017 30/04/2018 12/02/2018 $464,354 $212,421 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2016 30/04/2017 3/04/2017 $246,832 $189,993 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/10/2015 30/04/2016 14/06/2016 $182,349 $121,890 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hamish Matheson Treasurer 14/02/2025
Tim Daley Vice-President 16/02/2024
Andrew Henderson President 18/02/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jared Chin Treasurer 14/02/2025
Angus Dysart-Paul President 16/02/2024
Mac George Bolderston Treasurer 17/02/2023
Angus Dysart-Paul Vice-President 18/02/2022
Richard Thomas Polson President 18/02/2022
Geoffrey Sullivan Vice President 19/02/2021
Andrew John Seaton Springford Treasurer 23/02/2018
Jeremy Wiremu Alexander Johnson President 23/02/2018
Alexander Malcolm McKinnon Committee Member 24/02/2017
Graeme Frank Rhodes Treasurer 27/02/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/02/2025 NOC017
15/09/2022 NOC014
8/04/2019 NOC009
8/04/2019 NOC008
14/06/2016 NOC005
2/04/2014 NOC004
24/06/2011 AR003
26/04/2010 NOC002
26/04/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.