pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Circus Trust
The Circus Hub
CC36451
9429043056484
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

11 Hutchison Road
Newtown
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

04 380 0051
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/wellingtoncircus/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster a thriving professional and recreational circus community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Trust has up to nine trustees, and fifteen paid employees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 3/06/2021 $427,993 $373,366
30/06/2020 29/06/2020 $401,453 $399,560
30/06/2019 12/06/2019 $375,494 $351,853
30/06/2018 26/06/2018 $369,326 $385,113
30/06/2017 17/05/2017 $363,017 $340,780
30/06/2016 4/05/2016 $314,967 $310,453
30/06/2015 13/05/2015 $321,608 $332,330
30/06/2014 29/07/2014 $315,954 $326,102
30/06/2013 19/09/2013 $241,802 $228,827
30/09/2012 15/09/2012 $131,411 $131,975

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angharad Siân George Board member 19/03/2020
Grace Lan Goris Board member 19/03/2020
Zane Sebastian Jarvie Board Member 2/10/2019
Nicholas Jad Creech Board Member 12/08/2019
Coral Ann Laughton Co-Chair 9/06/2019
Jason Parlour Co-Chair 4/02/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Carolyn Ann Newman Board Member 18/11/2021
Kate Elizabeth Mills Board Member 4/02/2021
Tanya Drewery Board member 6/11/2020
Kathrine Biggs Chair 15/01/2020
Malia Ann Johnston Board Member 12/12/2019
Emma Catherine Beale Board member 16/09/2019
Anjali Pande Board member 9/06/2019
Samuel Peter Edwin Rorke Board Member 7/08/2018
Jason Cruickshanks Board member 19/05/2018
Sean Dwen Board Member 19/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/12/2021 NOC035
18/02/2021 NOC033
8/01/2021 NOC032
8/04/2020 NOC030
12/12/2019 NOC029
10/12/2019 NOC028
12/09/2019 NOC027
21/06/2019 NOC026
14/01/2019 NOC024
9/12/2018 NOC023

Charity Documents