Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Bluff Community Medical Trust
CC36633
9429042872016
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 41
Bluff
9842
2 Tone Street
Bluff 9814
Bluff
Bluff
9814

Charity's other details

03 212 7337
03 212 7326
Bluff Community Medical Centre


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To enhance the health of our patients through the provision of accessible and comprehensive healthcare.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provision of primary healthcare

Health

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, People with disabilities, Provision of healthcare to Bluff and surrounding areas

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Trust consists of 12 Board Members from the Bluff Community, who employ and support the Medical Clinic staff, as well as maintain the property and assets of the Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30/05/2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30/05/2010 .

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 13/12/2024 13/12/2024 $845,885 $903,767 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 29/09/2023 $899,699 $857,167 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 2/11/2022 $913,469 $771,327 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 14/10/2021 $745,394 $743,760 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 21/10/2020 20/10/2020 $796,000 $649,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 19/08/2019 $599,174 $575,859 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 21/02/2019 $542,500 $521,693 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/08/2017 $533,335 $519,525 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 15/09/2016 $521,501 $528,580 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pamela van der Watt Secretary Non Trustee 20/02/2024
Nicola Allan Trustee 1/10/2022
Neil Peter Sutherland Trustee 16/09/2013
Paul Bryan Potter Trustee 20/10/2010
Astrid Christine Brocklehurst Trustee 26/10/1990
Meri-Eileen Leask Trustee 26/10/1990
Robyn Marie Horwell Chairperson and Trustee 26/10/1990

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Swann Chaiman 28/08/2024
Bruce William Pagan Trustee and Chairman 20/02/2024
Rowena Phillipson Secretary and Trustee 20/02/2024
Katarina Ngamu Eruera Trustee 11/07/2023
Margaret Ellen Black Trustee 1/12/2022
Andrew McLean Trust Member 22/02/2022
Robert Mark Glassey Trustee 21/12/2021
Christopher Trevor Lee Nom Trustee 20/04/2021
Trevor Graham Wilkey Trustee 15/03/2014
Ian David Goldsworthy Chairman 14/12/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/09/2024 NOC031
1/09/2024 NOC030
26/06/2024 NOC029
11/03/2024 NOC027
20/07/2023 NOC023
5/07/2023 NOC022
21/02/2019 NOC017
17/09/2018 NOC015
21/11/2014 NOC011
13/03/2014 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.