Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Petone Samoan Assembly Of God
CC36725
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

8 Campbell Terrace
Petone
Lower Hutt
5012
13 Campbell Terrace
Petone
Lower Hutt
5012

Charity's other details

045684370/045687471


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of our charity is about spreading the gospel and to hold religious services and activities. Our church is also a place for families and communities to meet, network and hold meetings such as youth groups, educate and share Christian experiences with church members We hold classes such as prayer meetings, bible studies, church events and various other church gatherings, and look after the wellbeing of our people

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Religious groups

Entity Structure

We are a non-profit organisation and are affiliated with other assemblies of God churches. Our own structure has a committee which includes one president, a treasurer and a secretary. We also have a board of trustees which includes 5 volunteers. Our main source comes from internal fundraising from church members/families. Other sources are from voluntary donations/tithes. Our funds are mainly used to pay for running cost for the church and various Ad-hoc expenses.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 18/10/2024 14/10/2024 $125,485 $114,485 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 31/08/2023 $122,475 $115,630 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 5/10/2022 $95,045 $84,383 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 16/09/2021 $124,995 $115,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2019 31/12/2019 8/01/2020 $124,288 $120,876 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 31/12/2018 21/12/2018 $97,188 $117,604 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 3/05/2018 $82,617 $104,281 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 16/09/2016 $196,000 $131,820 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Afele Fonoti Afele Chairman 4/06/2020
Kalapu Masoe Treasurer 30/06/2008
Faitasi Fuatagaumu Secretary 23/01/1994

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/09/2020 NOC012
27/08/2015 NOC006
11/07/2013 AR006
20/07/2012 AR005
29/03/2011 AR003
1/10/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.