pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hamilton Land Search And Rescue Trust
CC37049
9429043143764
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 4100
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3247
12 Anzac Parade
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

020 4099 3329


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide people and equipment to assist The New Zealand Police in land based searches for missing persons. The Group specialises in searching for people lost in bush and towns throughout the Waikato. By working closely with the Police we provide a valuable service to the children, the elderly, hunters and trampers who are unfortunate enough to become lost. The Group has a comprehensive training program to ensure that members skills are maintained at the highest levels.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Search and Rescue equipment

Emergency / disaster relief

Social services, Search and Rescue

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Trust is managed by a committee, consisting of a Chairperson, Administrator, Human Resource Manager, Operations Manager, Training manager, Finance Manager, and Police Representative.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 29/08/2023 $10,395 $12,751
30/09/2022 4/07/2022 $15,595 $12,301
30/09/2021 27/07/2021 $13,287 $19,396
30/09/2020 6/09/2020 $18,364 $17,891
30/09/2019 13/06/2019 $37,423 $15,426
30/09/2018 14/06/2018 $26,359 $15,872
30/09/2017 18/09/2017 $14,579 $15,958
30/09/2016 30/08/2016 $12,615 $9,549
30/09/2015 23/11/2015 $8,469 $12,009
30/09/2014 4/09/2014 $7,189 $5,492

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Matthew George Llewellyn Brown Treasurer/Trustee 21/09/2020
Matthew John Sherwin Chairperson/Trustee 18/06/2017
Virginia Peck Trustee 1/04/2010
Matthew Hassard Operations/trustee 19/05/2008
Russell Lamb Trustee/ Other 6/09/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joan Waveney Parker Chairperson/Trustee 14/09/2020
Scott Alchin Treasurer/Trustee 14/09/2020
Gilbert Southworth Treasurer 16/06/2014
Jacob David Crosby Chairman 16/06/2014
Michael Bland Trustee/Chairman 1/04/2013
Elton Parata Trustee 9/07/2012
John Twizel Trustee/ Other 1/09/2011
Ralph Goudswaard Trustee 1/09/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/11/2020 NOC016
10/11/2020 NOC015
17/06/2016 NOC008
21/05/2015 NOC007
23/09/2013 AR006
24/09/2012 AR005
10/07/2012 NOC001
28/09/2011 AR004
8/06/2010 AR003

Charity Documents