pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Multicultural Whangarei Incorporated
CC37124
9429043166503
Registered

Registration details

25/01/2009
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Whangarei Migrant Centre Incorporated 26/01/2009
Multicultural Whangarei Incorporated 25/09/2018

Address for service

37 Bank Street
Whangarei
0110
37 Bank Street
Civic Arcade Upstairs
Whangarei
110

Charity's other details

09 430 0571
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/multiculturalwhangarei/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We provide advice, information and advocacy for migrants and newcomers to Whangarei.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Support to migrants

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The organisation is governed by a management committee, elected at the AGM. The Centre's business and goals are achieved through the partnership of the committee and co-ordinator, who is a paid employee. The co-ordinator also co-ordinates the Centre's day to day business for our migrants and newcomers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 17/02/2021 $173,227 $165,360
31/01/2020 28/01/2020 $94,604 $95,383
31/12/2018 28/09/2018 $103,918 $79,368
31/12/2017 12/11/2017 $104,314 $103,845
31/12/2016 26/11/2016 $93,047 $77,886
31/12/2015 16/12/2015 $80,988 $80,693
31/12/2014 18/02/2015 $61,362 $55,579
31/12/2013 4/12/2013 $47,396 $52,939
31/12/2012 26/04/2013 $51,498 $53,573

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anita Neil Treasurer 6/07/2021
Barney Nathan Mackie Committee Member 8/06/2021
Sanjana Weragodaarachichi Secretary 16/02/2021
Rabin Ranji Committee Member 3/08/2020
Sandeep Diwan Committee Member 3/08/2020
Marion Kerepeti Edwards Chair 17/09/2019
Mei Zhu Committee Member 17/09/2019
Sun Lyoung Kim Committee member 25/09/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jane Scripps Committee member 8/08/2021
Jos Polman Committee member 11/05/2021
Sharon Ho Secretary 5/10/2020
Leah Veronica Peacock Committee member 28/09/2020
Shashi Kariyawasam Committee Member 3/08/2020
Suzzette Monroe Deputy chair 3/08/2020
Justin Kim Committee member 15/10/2019
Eden Donald committee 17/09/2019
Leah Veronica Peacock Chair 17/09/2019
Marion Kerepeti Committee 17/09/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/08/2021 NOC032
18/02/2021 NOC031
19/12/2019 NOC027
2/10/2019 NOC026
30/09/2019 NOC025
30/09/2019 NOC024
26/09/2019 NOC023
28/09/2018 NOC021
9/10/2017 NOC019
30/05/2017 NOC018

Charity Documents