Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Hutt Valley Community Law Centre Trust
CC37129
9429043015559
Deregistered
16/09/2012
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been merged with another charitable entity.

Below are details of Hutt Valley Community Law Centre Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 16/09/2012 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has been merged with another charitable entity.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 48053
Silverstream
Upper Hutt
5142
LEVEL 2
59 Queens Drive
Hutt Central
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

(04) 9709659
(04) 9709659


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research

Other (please state)

(Provide for the unmet legal needs of the Hutt Valley in any sector where there is injustice.), Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Marae on reservation land, Community development, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(Those in the Hutt who suffer from barriers to justice and therefore have an unmet legal need.), Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 3/09/2012 $415,320 $423,660 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 29/12/2011 $439,779 $419,696 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 21/02/2011 $444,085 $411,542 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2009 31/12/2009 11/01/2010 $408,333 $267,609 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gerald Stanley Bealing Trustee 1/10/2009
Faatili Iosua Esera Pacific Trustee 26/01/2009
Francis Georgina Whata Community Trustee 26/01/2009
Julian Nigel Paton Community Trustee 26/01/2009
Brendan John Randal Mcdonnell Trustee 1/07/2008
Joy Rangi Bullen Trust Chair 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Terrence Robinson Trustee 1/01/2012
Kumar Bajaj Trustee 1/12/2009
Joy Fiapalagi Sipeli Trustee 1/11/2009
Janet Mary Marsland Trustee 1/07/2009
Janice Farris Trustee - Pacific 1/07/2009
Richard Williams Trustee 1/07/2009
Kathleen Mary Satory Trustee 26/11/2008
Kuresa Tiumalu-falesuega Trustee 24/09/2008
Lorraine Thelma Coulston Trustee 1/09/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/09/2012 AR005
21/02/2011 AR003
11/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.