pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hutt Valley Trust
Lower Hutt Islamic Centre
CC37154
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

20 Hunter Street
Taita
Lower Hutt
5011
14 Hunter Street
Petone
Taita
Lower Hutt
5011

Charity's other details

029 7754480


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide Educational, Religious social and welfare services to Muslim community in Hutt region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Community development, Religious activities, Fund-raising

Children / young people

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trustees are responsible for all Trust's activities

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 23/09/2022 $118,560 $27,270
30/09/2021 21/09/2021 $181,784 $24,047
30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $43,753 $29,959
30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $40,540 $22,270
30/09/2018 20/09/2018 $19,125 $17,075
30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $14,215 $13,390
30/09/2016 17/10/2016 $21,036 $15,177
30/09/2015 15/09/2015 $33,772 $17,824
30/09/2014 26/09/2014 $21,122 $18,825
30/09/2013 20/09/2013 $20,485 $13,160

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mohammed Delower Hossain Bhuiyan Trustee 1/04/2022
MUHAMMAD ASHRAF Trustee 5/09/2021
Abdel Hamid Mohamad Al Ghaiber Trustee 1/10/2020
Fathima Iftikar Mohideen Trustee 1/10/2020
Moontaz Ali Azmutally Trustee 1/10/2020
Naila Rahman Trustee 1/10/2020
Naing Zahid Aung Trustee 1/10/2020
Naseeruddin Shaik Khwaja Trustee 1/10/2020
Tuan Mohammed Saliheen Saldin Trustee 1/10/2020
Asad Abdullahi Trustee 14/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mansour Zamanpoor Trustee 7/07/2022
Aseiah Abbas Mirza Trustee 28/02/2022
Adam Deeq Deer Trustee 1/07/2020
Monwar Ibrahim Trustee 7/02/2020
Mohammed Hanif Khan Trustee 24/01/2018
Siffrool Udhuman Trustee 12/10/2016
Abdi Ahmed Bihi Trustee 12/10/2015
Said Ben Brahim Trustee 12/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/03/2022 NOC018
7/01/2022 NOC017
7/01/2022 NOC016
6/01/2022 NOC015
5/09/2021 NOC013
19/07/2020 NOC010
26/01/2018 NOC006
10/11/2009 AR002

Charity Documents