pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Bird Rescue Charitable Trust
NZ Bird Rescue Charitable Trust trading as Birdcare Aotearoa
CC37288
9429043286683
Registered

Registration details

29/01/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 80252
Green Bay
Auckland
0643
74 Avonleigh Road
Green Bay
Auckland
0604

Charity's other details

021 08437146
Facebook icon image
BirdCare Aotearoa


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

NZ Bird Rescue is a dedicated wild bird rehabilitation facility responding to avian casualties, primarily, in the Auckland region and aiding with technical and educational support to all rehabilitation facilities and wildlife agencies in NZ. Avian patients are admitted because they are sick, orphaned or injured. Each bird is examined by a member of the clinical team, its care and rehabilitation planned to ensure professional, science-based rehabilitation and appropriate nutritional support to ensure its recovery. The goal is to release all healthy and fully recovered birds back to the wild.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Rescue, rehabilitation and release of sick and inferred bird life.

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation

Animals

General public

Entity Structure

Trustees, staff and volunteers. There are currently a team of five Trustees, a full-time General Manager, three veterinarians comprising a full-time Clinical Manager, a part-time Clinician and a supervising veterinarian, a full-time and two part-time Avian Rehabilitators, a part-time Administration/Accounts Manager and a part-time Volunteer Manager. Seasonal Avian Nursery Rehabilitators are employed from October to March. Volunteer support was provided by 64 team members. Community groups such

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 30/09/2009 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filling their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 30/09/2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 13/07/2021 $533,129 $571,394
30/09/2020 2/09/2020 $174,246 $551,040
30/09/2019 19/04/2020 $131,604 $434,276
30/09/2018 4/03/2019 $204,248 $358,749
30/09/2017 18/10/2018 $229,445 $196,766
30/09/2016 28/11/2016 $147,301 $110,327
30/09/2015 10/11/2015 $193,753 $157,271
30/09/2014 25/09/2014 $151,132 $151,501
30/09/2013 29/08/2013 $111,374 $102,551

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Charles Russell Trustee 20/05/2020
Lorne George Roberts Trustee 8/04/2017
Alice Joyce Worsley Trustee 15/03/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Janice Patricia Avey Chair 8/07/2021
Dianne Falls Paton Trustee 18/06/2021
Jitske van den Heever Trustee 3/02/2021
Miriam Clare Whelan Board Trustee 8/05/2020
Yvonne Therese Dufaur Trustee 7/06/2019
Lois Hannah Trustee 10/04/2018
Hillary Frances Stollery Trustee 5/03/2017
Evelyn Frances Joan Macdonald Trustee 11/02/2017
Renee Henderson Trustee 31/12/2016
David Gould Russell Short Trustee 23/09/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/05/2021 NOC025
3/09/2020 NOC024
24/08/2020 NOC022
18/02/2019 NOC018
12/11/2018 NOC017
7/03/2017 NOC014
14/02/2017 NOC013
13/02/2017 NOC012
26/09/2016 NOC009
20/09/2016 NOC008

Charity Documents