Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lake Ōkāreka Volunteer Fire Brigade Incorporated
CC37410
9429042657033
Registered

Registration details

3/02/2009
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Lake Okareka Fire Force Incorporated 4/02/2009
Lake Ōkāreka Volunteer Fire Brigade Incorporated 20/10/2021

Address for service

10 Steep Street
RD 5
Lake Okareka
Rotorua
3076
1 Acacia Road
Okareka Loop Road
Lake Okareka
Rotorua
3076

Charity's other details

027 777 5130
https://www.facebook.com/OkarekaFireBrigade
https://www.linkedin.com/company/10588805


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Fire and Emergency New Zealand - Lake Ōkāreka Volunteer Fire Brigade. The Lake Ōkāreka Station is a volunteer station in the Rotorua Region providing key emergency response for the Rotorua District and beyond.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Emergency / disaster relief

Promotion of volunteering

General public

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 24/09/2024 $15,890 $19,022 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 25/09/2024 $11,730 $4,784 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 26/01/2023 $21,148 $309,321 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 26/07/2021 $179,642 $142,686 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 15/06/2020 $21,197 $10,765 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 5/12/2019 $18,594 $1,604 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 24/01/2019 $294,433 $88,687 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/01/2019 $76,767 $55,915 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 27/07/2018 $12,971 $14,251 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angus Lyall Treasurer 29/11/2023
Philip Muldoon Committee Member 25/01/2023
Erin Eggleston Committee Member 23/11/2022
Nicole Powell Secretary 23/11/2022
Kierin Oppatt Chairman 21/08/2019
Stuart Lyall Committee Member 6/08/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Connor Potter Treasurer 29/11/2023
Kelsey O’Connor Committee Member 29/11/2023
Leah van Boven Committee Member 29/11/2023
Philip Muldoon Chairman 25/01/2023
Benedict Larkin Treasurer 23/11/2022
Blair Gilbert Committee Member 23/11/2022
Chris Scoggins Committee Member 23/11/2022
Johan Laven Health and Safety Co-ordinator 23/11/2022
Pene-tiaki Pitama Committee Member 23/11/2022
Pennie Muldoon Secretary 23/11/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/09/2023 NOC026
18/01/2023 NOC024
31/10/2021 NOC023
23/03/2021 NOC021
10/02/2021 NOC020
5/12/2019 NOC017
5/11/2015 NOC013
5/11/2015 NOC012
8/08/2014 NOC010
7/08/2014 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.