Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Wellington Association For Deaf Children Incorporated
CC37537
9429042917410
Deregistered
11/09/2023
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act

Below are details of Wellington Association For Deaf Children Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 11/09/2023 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

16 Hector Street
Seatoun
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/Wellingtonassociationfordeafchildren/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Aims to promote the social and educational well-being of deaf and hard of hearing children and young people in the greater Wellington area.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Incorporated society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 31/08/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2020 $40 $11,324 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2019 $55 $2,408 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 29/06/2018 $58,973 $29,994 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $60,196 $39,362 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $530 $1,006 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 29/06/2015 $247 $951 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2014 $451 $1,718 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Helen Rosalie Christianson Secretary 2/11/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Stewart Treasurer 2/11/2022
Andrea Craig Committee Member 23/06/2012
Susan Jane Trembath Committee Member 23/06/2012
Marie Louise Gilmer Treasurer 4/05/2012
Patricia Jane Laing President 4/05/2011
Maria Bernadette Sabo Committee Member 19/06/2010
Tania Tiopira - Waaka Committee Member 19/06/2010
Veronica Anne Kozera Secretary 20/06/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/08/2023 NOC010
25/06/2012 AR005
21/07/2011 AR004
15/05/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.