Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Leprosy Mission New Zealand Incorporated
CC37638
9429043066490
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 96262
Balmoral
Auckland
1342
591 Dominion Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1041

Charity's other details

09 630 2818
https://www.facebook.com/leprosymissionnz

Oceania

Kiribati, Papua New Guinea

Africa

Congo, Democratic Republic of, Ethiopia, Mozambique, Niger, Zambia

Asia

Bangladesh, East Timor, India, Indonesia, Nepal


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Leprosy Mission New Zealand is a Christian development organisation that works with leprosy-affected families and their communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

International activities

Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Religious activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

People affected by Leprosy

Entity Structure

Incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 29/05/2023 $6,216,774 $5,783,384 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 25/05/2022 $5,965,520 $4,887,263 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 13/06/2021 $5,734,708 $4,891,733 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 2/06/2020 $5,197,380 $4,707,533 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 10/06/2019 $4,229,370 $3,834,753 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 21/05/2018 $4,327,665 $3,870,533 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 28/05/2017 $5,046,703 $3,879,851 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 16/05/2016 $4,721,706 $4,272,533 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 17/05/2015 $4,505,596 $5,223,149 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nadine Rutter Board Member 27/05/2023
Nicholas Fagerlund Board Member 27/05/2023
Graham Mills Board Treasurer 23/05/2022
Andre Stuart Board Member/Chair 25/05/2019
Blair Matheson Board Member 25/05/2019
Gillian Whitley Executive Director 1/08/2016
Jo Burnett Board Member 14/05/2016
Andrew Stott Board Member 16/05/2015
Kathleen Gavin Board Member 26/05/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter McGhee Board Member 27/05/2023
Odele Habets Board Member/Chair 12/11/2022
Grant Pollock Board Member/Treasurer 21/05/2022
Anne Ratliff Board Member 7/11/2020
Phil Johnstone Board Member 7/11/2020
Susan Louise Maiava Board Member 18/05/2018
Ramon Pink Board Member 20/05/2017
Brent Morgan Executive Director 29/07/2016
Vincent Naidu Board member 16/05/2015
Yeri Ahn Board Member 16/05/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/02/2024 NOC030
28/11/2023 NOC028
29/05/2023 NOC025
15/11/2022 NOC024
10/11/2020 NOC021
18/05/2020 NOC019
13/12/2018 NOC017
13/12/2018 NOC016
15/08/2016 NOC013
16/05/2016 NOC012
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.