Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Correspondence School Parents and Supervisors Association Incorporated
TCSPSA
CC38010
9429042937074
Registered

Registration details

23/02/2009
December 31

Address for service

33 McDonald Road
RD 6
Glenure
Gore
9776

Charity's other details

0272909586


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Mission is to safeguard and advance the interests of full time students of The Correspondence School (Te Aho o te Kura Pounamu) and to support parents, caregivers and supervisors. Our Objectives are to enhance educational outcomes for full-time students, to support branches and members through an independent, effective organization and to promote our members needs in the wider education environment. We offer support to supervisors/families/parents, assist at school days and camps, assist with training of Supervisors, ensure that students and family’s needs are met and lobby government on issues affecting TCS families and students.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Acts as an umbrella for our areas/branches

Education / training / research

Community development, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, professional development of supervisors

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Religious groups, conference is held in church building

Entity Structure

Members of The Correspondence School Parents and Supervisors Association Incorporated elect a management commitee, which includes a chair, vice chair, treasurer and secretary and general members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 14/06/2024 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 3/06/2023 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 24/03/2022 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 21/05/2021 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 20/04/2020 $2 $62 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 28/06/2019 $25 $203 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 3/07/2018 $122 $216 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 25/08/2017 $403 $1,810 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 23/06/2016 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angela Osten-McIntyre Secretary 19/12/2016
Helen van Echtelt Treasurer 26/05/2016
Alistair Davidson Vice President 27/05/2014
Alistair Nicholls President 27/05/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Deborah Jean Searle Treasurer 2/04/2017
Annie Joyce Wyllie Secretary 31/05/2016
Suzanne Kim Cameron President 31/05/2016
Rachel Elizabeth Clunie President 30/05/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/01/2024 NOC015
15/03/2017 NOC007
25/06/2016 NOC006
6/06/2016 NOC005
24/06/2014 NOC004
9/06/2010 AR002
3/06/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.