Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kaibosh
Kaibosh Food Rescue
CC38367
9429043092741
Registered

Registration details

10/03/2009
June 30

Address for service

11 Hopper Street
Mount Cook
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 385 0825
https://www.facebook.com/Kaibosh.NZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Kaibosh has a mission 'To be the link between the food industry and charities that support people in need.' Kaibosh has a vision of 'Zero Food Poverty, Zero Food Waste'.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Food Redistribution)

Social services

Environment / conservation

Other charities

Disadvantaged People

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 21/10/2024 $1,164,788 $1,382,255 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 9/11/2023 $1,336,034 $1,269,361 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 21/11/2022 $1,316,370 $1,124,988 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 12/10/2021 $967,401 $971,603 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 24/11/2020 $1,021,729 $717,937 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 3/12/2019 $696,919 $591,652 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 5/12/2018 $634,610 $539,432 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 20/12/2017 $513,056 $469,486 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 16/12/2016 $462,606 $384,450 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 20/11/2015 $287,069 $235,541 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Toni Lucia Grace Trustee 10/12/2024
Ganesh Nana Treasurer 16/10/2024
Kate Mitcalfe Trustee 15/10/2024
Ainsleigh Papali'i Laumatia Trustee 14/06/2023
Susanne Jane Robertson Chief Executive 12/06/2023
Mark Adrian Ratcliffe Chairperson 8/04/2020
Stephanie Margaret Coutts Trustee 8/04/2020
Diana Buchanan Crossan Trustee 9/10/2018
Kathryn Robinson Trustee 1/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kellie Benner Trustee 10/12/2024
Paul Edward Harford Treasurer 15/10/2024
Te Kawa Tangata Gordon Robb Trustee 29/04/2024
Asena Tolungamaka Trustee 12/04/2023
Tessa Jane Vincent Secretary 14/04/2021
Amanda Burgess Chairperson 11/12/2019
Sue Driver Trustee 10/04/2019
Ken Allen Trustee 18/04/2018
Beth Brash Trustee 13/12/2017
Nicole Taylor Treasurer 11/10/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/03/2025 NOC045
4/03/2025 NOC044
3/03/2025 NOC043
16/01/2025 NOC042
21/10/2024 NOC040
21/10/2024 NOC039
15/10/2024 NOC038
1/03/2022 NOC034
20/04/2020 NOC031
20/04/2020 NOC030
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.