Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Ataarangi Trust
CC38373
9429043165148
Registered

Registration details

10/03/2009
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 9161
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
53B King Street
Frankton
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

0210687642


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

a) foster speaking, reading and writing of the Maori language; b) provide and promote, through the medium of the Maori language, instruction in: i) Maori arts, crafts, values, genealogy and history; ii) preservation and conservation of New Zealand’s natural resources; iii) individual self-reliance, health and economic stability; iv) parenting skills; v) non-violent conflict resolution. c) organise Maori language learning programmes; d) encourage and support Maori language learning groups recognised by the Trust; e) encourage research into language learning; f) develop and produce resources for use in Maori language learning programmes; g) organise training programmes, seminars and conferences for Maori language tutors and students in accordance with Clause (d); h) Any other charitable purposes as the Runanga may decide; i) receive, seek and disburse government and non-government funding for all or any of the objects above; and j) Promote these through'rohe'

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 31/07/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 31/08/2024 28/08/2024 $981,991 $1,052,427 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/09/2023 26/09/2023 $945,786 $1,140,676 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 31/08/2022 23/08/2022 $910,298 $1,121,105 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 6/10/2021 $1,112,686 $1,197,981 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2020 $1,190,994 $981,343 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $1,188,243 $1,587,254 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2018 $2,324,728 $2,429,058 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $2,943,655 $2,321,909 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 26/06/2016 $3,225,463 $2,452,668 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Miriamai Barbour Trustee 14/10/2022
Rukuwa Daniel Trustee 23/08/2022
Shane Graham Trustee 16/10/2020
Hine McLetchie Trustee 28/10/2019
Phillecity Ngarangione Trustee 28/10/2019
Anaru Rieper Chairperson 1/07/2018
Okeroa Waitai Trustee 1/07/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Maureen Muller Vice Chair 31/10/2022
Parehau Richards Trustee 17/09/2021
Rawinia White Trustee 30/11/2020
Cathy Dewes Trustee 30/06/2018
Erana Lee Brewerton Deputy Chairperson 30/06/2018
Ewan Pohe Trustee 30/06/2018
Jeremy Banks Trustee 30/06/2018
Maira Alison Pihema Trustee 30/06/2018
Ruakere Hond Trustee 30/06/2018
Mikaere Taitoko Trustee 9/10/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/11/2024 NOC025
16/10/2020 NOC019
29/10/2019 NOC018
27/08/2018 NOC015
27/06/2016 NOC011
17/11/2015 NOC010
16/11/2015 NOC009
22/06/2015 NOC008
22/06/2015 NOC007
16/06/2014 NOC006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.