Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


GFA NZ Trust
GFA World
CC38542
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/03/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 302580
North Harbour
Auckland
751
100 Bush Road
Rosedale
Auckland
0632

Charity's other details


Asia

India


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

GFA NZ is in partnership with Believers Eastern Church, Manjadi, P.O. Thiruvalla, Kerala, India which is a charitable and non-profit making organisation, working in the field of Health/Social Welfare/Education on a non-sectarian basis without discrimination of Caste, Creed or Religion, as certified by the State Government of Kerala. GFA NZ will work primarily amongst the Dalit and Other Backward Caste communities in South Asia with the purpose of helping these historically disadvantaged communities and individuals to rise above their circumstances and to have a meaningful place in society. Activities will include: Vocational training of workers. Provision of personal and work needs of workers. Provision of food, clothing, health care and education for children who would otherwise have limited or no access to these basic necessities of life. Adult education and training in areas such as hygiene, alcohol and drug abuse, social and work skills, parenting, etc.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, International activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Religious groups

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30/09/2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30/09/2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/11/2024 16/02/2025 $131,013 $156,184 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 7/12/2023 9/11/2023 $150,623 $212,591 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 20/07/2022 $177,036 $184,340 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 31/08/2021 $216,897 $188,137 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 24/09/2020 $177,824 $181,228 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 26/10/2019 $58,161 $192,124 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 31/10/2018 31/10/2018 $91,969 $170,136 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $346,114 $144,989 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 11/10/2016 $339,096 $227,649 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Chris Rodney Brewer Trustee 14/03/2018
Daniel Punnose Trustee 14/03/2018
Murray Grant Bell Trustee 17/03/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Yohannan Kadappiliaril Punnose Trustee 8/05/2024
John Robert Beers Trustee 7/07/2018
Brian Alexander Hughes Trustee 4/12/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/07/2024 NOC019
10/05/2024 NOC018
19/07/2018 NOC011
15/03/2018 NOC010
15/03/2016 NOC007
11/12/2015 NOC006
4/12/2015 NOC005
27/09/2013 AR005
24/09/2012 AR004
16/09/2011 AR003
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.