Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hearts Aflame Catholic Summer School
CC38744
9429049505863
Registered

Registration details

23/03/2009
March 31

Address for service

12 Ranginui Drive
Kaiapoi
7630

Charity's other details

021 1071284


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advancing and teaching the religious tenets, doctrines, observances and culture associated with the Roman Catholic faith.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The School was established in 1991 with the intention of providing annual summer schools which promote the Catholic faith among young adults through formative instruction and worship in accordance with the teachings of the Magisterium of the Catholic Church. The School shall have a Planning Team and a minimum of six Officers including the Chaplain; The role of the officers includes to appoint and remove the Director and Chaplain.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 30/09/2023 $84,234 $91,178 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 7/07/2022 $136,892 $6,651 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 15/09/2021 $98,280 $80,598 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 26/08/2020 $91,821 $90,459 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $70,631 $109,463 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 23/09/2018 $62,384 $24,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $63,558 $53,061 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 27/09/2016 $67,239 $66,824 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 26/09/2015 $82,477 $86,578 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Adams Officer/Chaplain 16/09/2023
Jacob Paul Michael Ulmer Treasurer 5/11/2017
Thomas James Henry Saywell Officer 5/11/2017
Jemma Marie Brunton Chair 12/01/2014
Brendan Thomas Malone Officer 1/12/2008
Katherine Louise Malone Secretary 1/12/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Donella Manson Officer 18/11/2018
Anna Surrey Officer 5/11/2017
Ben Gorman Leadership Team Member 5/11/2017
Brendan Boyce Leadership Team Member 12/01/2014
Emily Gorman Treasurer 12/01/2014
Rebecca Archer Secretary 21/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/02/2022 NOC017
13/02/2022 NOC016
26/07/2020 NOC012
28/10/2018 NOC010
28/10/2018 NOC009
7/07/2018 NOC007
16/04/2014 NOC004
11/09/2012 AR004
19/09/2011 AR003
22/09/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.