Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Wellington Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Incorporated
Wellington SPCA
CC38841
9429042911906
Deregistered
03/02/2021

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of Wellington Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 3/02/2021 The charity is consolidating and deregistering the local branches or similar entities. The national or parent body will continue to be a registered charity
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 15349
New Lynn
Auckland
0640
140 Alexandra Road
Newtown
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

09 827 6094


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of SPCA New Zealand . Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
SPCA Investments Limited
SPCA Social Enterprises Limited
The Royal New Zealand Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance animal welfare and prevent cruelty

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(To advance animal welfare and prevent cruelty)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief

Animals

General public

Entity Structure

On 1 November 2017 this SPCA centre voted to become part of 'One' SPCA (RNZSPCA - CC 22705, Inc No. 218546). All centres were previously seperate Incorporated Societies. See the Charity Documents section for this Centre, which has details in press release. Queries to board.secretary@spca.nz

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Wairarapa Branch Of Royal New Zealand Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Inc CC23272

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 Member of 'SPCA New Zealand ' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2018 19/06/2019 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 7/03/2018 $5,706,675 $5,200,692 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 11/11/2016 $5,607,486 $4,815,172 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/12/2015 $4,328,429 $3,910,782 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 10/12/2014 $3,261,592 $3,675,859 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2013 31/12/2013 26/11/2013 $4,353,043 $3,394,084 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 19/12/2012 $3,257,683 $3,212,888 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 16/01/2012 $2,687,862 $3,517,308 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Logan Williams Board member 4/02/2020
Stephen Merchant Board member 4/02/2020
David Broderick Board Chair 1/01/2018
Natasha Whiting Board member 1/01/2018
Robyn Kiddle Board member 1/01/2018
Andrea Midgen CEO 1/11/2017
Gordon Trainer Board member 1/11/2017
Robyn O'Fee Board member 1/11/2017
Siobhan Hale-Pennington Board Member 11/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Geraldine Brookman Board member 31/12/2020
Bice Awan Board Member 31/12/2019
Theresa Gattung Board Member 23/03/2018
Charlotte Fisher Board Member 31/10/2017
Emanuel Kalafatelis Board member 31/10/2017
Mark Stevens Board Member 31/10/2017
Penelope England Board Member 31/10/2017
Robert Drew Stein Board Member (Director) 31/10/2017
Stephen Glassey Chief Executive Officer 31/10/2017
Matthew Stone Board Member 1/08/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/01/2021 NOC028
19/01/2021 NOC027
18/02/2020 NOC026
19/12/2019 NOC024
9/07/2019 NOC022
9/04/2019 NOC021
21/03/2019 NOC020
24/01/2019 NOC019
18/01/2019 NOC018
28/03/2018 NOC017
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.