Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Korean Society of Christchurch Incorporated
CC38883
9429042654094
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

455 Hagley Avenue
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03-354-6966
Korean society of Incorporated


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Korean society of Christchurch works to empower Korean-born individuals by providing programs and direct services that help them access community resources and opportunities. Korean society of Christchurch works to; a) to promote and to develop Korean cultural activities for the benefit of both Korean residents in Christchurch and the local community b) to maintain and improve the quality of life of Koreans in Christchurch c) to develop mutual relationship between members and to contribute to the ties of friendship between New Zealand and Korea d) to promote the awareness of Korean culture e) to encourage Korean community spirit and activity to co-ordinate community resources f) to develop interest in Korean history g) to undertake, promote, support and encourage other charitable works within Christchurch and New Zealand for the benefit of Koreans as the Society shall from time to time approve.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), To promote and to develop Korean cultural activities for te benefit of both Korean residents in Christchurch and the local community

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Society Structure : The affairs of the Society are managed and controlled by a Committee which consists of the following; a) One President b) Two Vice President c) Two other committee members (Treasurer, media director) d) One office administrator. Operational Structure: Our operations are managed by committee members of eight and one paid employee – administrative officer. We employ an office administrator. Volunteers support us with our various activities throughout the year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 21/02/2025 $49,024 $54,585 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 5/09/2023 $125,929 $109,941 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 20/07/2022 $82,181 $67,464 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $43,255 $48,705 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 7/05/2021 $25,475 $28,903 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 9/07/2019 $37,795 $36,075 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 7/10/2018 $41,808 $51,168 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 8/09/2017 $65,728 $77,993 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/08/2016 $70,443 $86,672 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return covers the period 1 April 2023 to 31 December 2023 (9 months).

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Daekyu Park Vice President 9/03/2024
Won Gag Kim Treasurer 9/03/2024
Jung Su Simon Oe President 28/05/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jin Saeng David Bae Vice President 9/03/2024
Mary Yoon President 9/03/2024
Sunjun Park Treasurer 9/03/2024
Chai Kim Vice President 15/05/2021
Jieun (Jenny) Lee Office Manager 15/05/2021
Kyojin (Judy) Yun President 15/05/2021
James Shin Director of Media 31/03/2020
Bang Hee Lee Office Manager 31/05/2019
Jung Eun Lee President 31/05/2019
Myoung Ah Lim Vice President 31/05/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/12/2024 NOC033
3/10/2024 NOC032
6/06/2024 NOC031
5/06/2024 NOC030
20/03/2024 NOC029
18/01/2024 NOC028
21/11/2023 NOC027
12/04/2023 NOC025
5/07/2021 NOC022
18/06/2020 NOC020
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.