Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Riding for the Disabled Association Hutt Valley Group Incorporated
Hutt Valley Riding for the Disabled HVRDA
CC38929
9429042816577
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 48129
Silverstream
Upper Hutt
5142
County Lane
Silverstream
Upper Hutt
5019

Charity's other details

04 527 8360
facebook.com/huttvalleyrda/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Riding For The Disabled New Zealand. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide horse riding opportunities to facilitate the training and rehabilitation of disabled persons whose physical and mental health is likely to benefit from such participation. Reach more riders change more lives

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Sport / recreation

People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 28/05/2024 $245,906 $327,212 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 8/06/2023 $242,835 $278,869 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 13/05/2022 $386,988 $233,229 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 17/05/2021 $211,870 $237,578 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 22/06/2020 $259,972 $235,992 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 12/06/2019 $332,278 $203,383 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 24/05/2018 $197,117 $160,231 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 5/06/2017 $125,230 $140,398 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 31/05/2016 $195,501 $131,814 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dee Harris Parent Representative 27/04/2023
Katrina Hamilton Parent Representative 27/04/2023
Jane Lee Board Member 20/06/2020
Patrick McDonald Health and Safety 30/04/2019
Colleen Joy Wright Chair 22/06/2017
Bronwyn Hussey Centre Co-ordinator 31/03/2009
Adrienne Manthel President 5/05/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Valerie Baker Board Member 27/04/2023
Lynne Lawson Marketing 28/04/2022
Raewyn Michelle Jennings Fundraising 30/04/2019
Hilary Eats Board Member 11/04/2018
Rachel Nankivell Marketing 11/04/2018
Shiel Mary Innes Barr Board Member 11/04/2018
Sandra Lee Bilderbeck Board Member 22/06/2017
Brian Jeffrey Cross Board Member 8/06/2017
Elise Scadding Committee Member 26/04/2017
Pauline Rae Whiston Committee Member 26/04/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/06/2019 NOC019
7/11/2017 NOC016
5/07/2017 NOC015
17/11/2016 NOC013
4/11/2014 NOC012
16/06/2014 NOC011
26/05/2014 NOC010
14/05/2013 AR006
5/11/2012 NOC005
8/05/2012 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.