Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Rūnanga-Ā-Iwi-Ō-Ngāpuhi
CC39363
9429042827405
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Te Runanga A Iwi O Ngapuhi 30/06/2008
Te Rūnanga-Ā-Iwi-Ō-Ngapuhi 27/11/2020
Te Rūnanga-Ā-Iwi-Ō-Ngāpuhi 7/01/2024

Address for service

PO Box 263
Kaikohe
440
Ngāwha Innovation and Enterprise Park
5449A State Highway 12
Kaikohe
0472

Charity's other details

(09) 401 5530
https://www.facebook.com/ngapuhirunanga


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Every purpose within New Zealand which in accordance with the laws of New Zealand for the time being is charitable, whether such purpose involves the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or religion, or any other object or purpose that is charitable within the laws of New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Marae on reservation land, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Whanau, hapu, Iwi development/ sprirtual

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Ngapuhi Asset Holding Company Limited CC39365
Ngapuhi Iwi Social Services Limited CC37423
Te Hau Ora O Ngapuhi Limited CC52449

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/08 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/09.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 8/02/2025 $3,204,611 $3,355,836 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 6/01/2024 $31,803,614 $25,758,989 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 17/11/2022 $3,920,351 $4,230,875 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 22/12/2021 $3,146,853 $3,410,204 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 2/02/2021 $5,422,418 $4,672,973 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $3,695,967 $3,695,633 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 28/12/2018 $3,901,861 $4,265,380 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $18,387,755 $16,749,779 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $17,204,531 $16,656,281 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 31/12/2015 $16,568,086 $15,569,985 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Richard Chester Fong Yip Proxy Trustee 1/12/2023
Te Ringakaha Leon John Ti Trustee 3/10/2023
Mori Tutekehua Utakura Rapana Trustee 10/09/2022
Mane Grant Tahere Chair 19/07/2022
Nicole Anderson Trustee 16/12/2019
Chrisandra Itirana Joyce Deputy Chair 17/11/2018
Janelle Beazley Trustee 28/10/2017
Te Rau Allen Trustee 14/11/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Friday Rountree Trustee 2/08/2024
William Russell Wane Wharerau Trustee 22/12/2023
Mere Mangu Trustee 3/10/2023
Bernadette Birch Trustee 10/09/2022
Ronald Keith Wihongi Trustee 19/07/2022
Joe O Bristowe Trustee 30/11/2020
Janett Helene Leaf Trustee 16/11/2019
Ngawai Tuson Trustee 16/11/2019
Raniera Tau Chairman 10/10/2019
Brian Joyce Trustee 17/11/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/05/2024 NOC030
29/05/2024 NOC029
7/01/2024 NOC028
18/11/2022 NOC025
18/11/2022 NOC024
20/06/2022 NOC023
27/11/2020 NOC020
2/09/2020 NOC019
20/12/2018 NOC015
27/07/2017 NOC013
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.