Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

The Methodist Church of New Zealand Te Haahi Weteriana O Aotearoa Swannanoa Methodist Model Deed Trust
Swannanoa Community Church
CC39664
N/A
Deregistered
21/06/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.

Below are details of The Methodist Church of New Zealand Te Haahi Weteriana O Aotearoa Swannanoa Methodist Model Deed Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

29/04/2009
June 30

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 21/06/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 29/04/2009

Address for service

C/-
53 Fuller Street
Kaiapoi
7630
Tram Road
Swannanoa

Charity's other details

03 327 7082


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

General public

Older people


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2012 31/12/2012 18/09/2012 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2011 31/12/2011 21/11/2011 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2010 31/12/2010 5/05/2011 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ambrose Theodore Prattley Trustee 15/07/1974
Ian Wilfred Lord Winter Trustee 15/07/1974
William John Lord Winter Trustee 28/07/1961
Walter Thomas Norris Jnr Trustee 22/02/1950

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Thomas Harvey Burgis Trustee 15/08/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/11/2011 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.