Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lancaster Park Cricket Club Incorporated
CC39720
9429042635475
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 10130
Phillipstown
Waltham
Christchurch
8145
70 Stevens Street
Hargood Street
Waltham
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/LancasterParkCC


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster, encourage and play the game of cricket.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Recreational Provider), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Adults

Entity Structure

Members elect a patron, president, one or more vice presidents, club captain and two trustees. The elective members of the management committee select no fewer than four club members as additional members of the management committee. At the first Management Committee meeting after the Annual General Meeting, a Chairman is elected. The management committee meets on a monthly basis and is empowered to generally manage and conduct the affairs of the club.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 31/12/2023 $110,900 $110,431 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 22/12/2022 $85,938 $87,897 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2021 $99,716 $108,386 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 5/01/2021 $145,624 $131,114 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 26/11/2019 $112,642 $125,916 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 6/01/2019 $107,231 $109,248 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 27/03/2018 $112,590 $103,767 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 6/12/2016 $92,400 $92,517 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 10/12/2015 $58,175 $69,082 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 12/01/2015 $80,321 $79,663 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ric Horsfall President 20/09/2020
Joshua Alan Bates Chairman 14/04/2019
Aaron Paul Reid Club captain - men 27/09/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Craig Thiele President 20/09/2020
Luke William Hayward Chairman 14/04/2019
Donald John Mckendry Trustee 1/10/2017
Iain Malcolm Trustee 1/10/2017
Wayne Gregory Derham Treasurer 30/09/2017
Ric Horsfall Chairman 30/09/2016
Ivan Lawson President 30/09/2015
John Raymond Stocker Vice president 30/09/2012
Peter Gordon Crowhen Vice Presdient 30/09/2012
Frances Louise Mackay Club captain - ladies 25/09/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/08/2022 NOC016
18/01/2016 NOC009
12/01/2015 NOC008
12/01/2015 NOC007
28/11/2012 NOC004
21/12/2011 NOC003
21/11/2011 AR004
29/10/2010 NOC002
20/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.