pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Thames Coast Kiwi Care Incorporated
CC40090
9429043158836
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 396
Thames
3540
208 Sealey Street
Thames 3500
Te Puru
Thames
3500

Charity's other details

0275779246
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Thames-Coast-Kiwi-Care-451941634970366


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A:"To protect and enhance the kiwi bird population on the Thames Coast" B:"Do anything necessary or helpful to the above." By the removal of mustelids and other threats, and through education of the local communities, to enhance the conditions for kiwi already resident there to the point where they represent a viable, self-sustaining and growing population.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Protection of Kiwi), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(All), Children / young people, Animals, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Members elect a committee, which includes Chair, Treasurer and Secretary. It employs one part time trapping coordinator. There are up to nine committee members and some 75 volunteers. There are two sub-committees; technical group, and the Publicity & Promotion group. The committee usually meets monthly and the sub-committees meet in between the main committee meetings.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $101,816 $96,053
30/09/2021 25/08/2021 $66,573 $72,104
30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $88,898 $76,002
30/09/2019 13/12/2019 $73,949 $42,340
30/09/2018 8/10/2018 $63,434 $54,515
30/09/2017 19/02/2018 $41,613 $44,866
30/09/2016 29/12/2016 $36,318 $23,900
30/09/2015 4/03/2016 $22,293 $22,142
30/09/2014 2/12/2014 $29,431 $18,223
30/09/2013 5/12/2013 $12,387 $10,564

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
April Heather Chang Committee Member 21/02/2022
Kevin James Robinson Committee Member 21/06/2019
George Bruce Duncan Wilson Treasurer 1/02/2019
Moira Grace Coatsworth Chair 30/06/2018
Richard Balfour Committee Member 23/02/2018
James Glenn Committee member 4/11/2017
Sally Avril Poulgrain Secretary 5/11/2016
Charles Finlay Buchanan Committee Member 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joanne Kaye Richards Committee Member 26/04/2022
Neil John committee member 14/11/2021
Clive Monds Treasurer 24/11/2018
John Longden Committee member 8/11/2018
Inge Bolt Chairperson 30/06/2018
Beverley May Walker Committee Member 5/11/2016
Richard Moyle Committee member 5/11/2016
Shelley Anne Carr Secretary 5/11/2016
Diane Marie Burton Committee Member 14/11/2015
Peter George Burton Committee/Co - Convenier 14/11/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2022 NOC028
31/05/2022 NOC027
13/05/2021 NOC025
13/05/2021 NOC024
30/01/2020 NOC022
29/01/2020 NOC021
10/10/2019 NOC019
10/10/2019 NOC018
9/10/2019 NOC017
12/12/2018 NOC016

Charity Documents