Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tairawhiti Positive Ageing Trust
CC40219
9429043101597
Registered

Registration details

19/05/2009
June 30

Address for service

562 Childers Road
Te Hapara
Gisborne
4010

Charity's other details

0279561383


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support older persons in Tairawhiti, by working in conjunction with service providers, to inform, educate and assist individuals to lead independent fulfilling and dignified lives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Other (please state)

(Ageing Issues), Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Older people

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust with 7 Trustees who represent a range of sectors supporting seniors

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 14/10/2024 $577 $5,380 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 4/12/2023 $286 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 14/12/2022 $4,803 $1,944 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 30/12/2021 $2,595 $460 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 23/12/2020 $2,464 $550 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 23/12/2019 $3,400 $5,079 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 17/12/2018 $4,479 $2,911 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 13/05/2018 $4,827 $4,928 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 15/06/2017 $5,621 $4,279 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 15/01/2016 $2,605 $922 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Noel Frederick Dunn Trustee 16/12/2019
Rosie Scott Trustee 26/11/2018
Alison Crawfford Trustee 8/12/2014
Judith Elaine Livingston Trustee 11/12/2013
Jean Baird Johnston Trustee 8/10/2008
Miriam Christina Swarbrick Trustee 8/10/2008
Nona Aston Trustee/Chairperson 8/10/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rehette Stoltz Trustee 16/12/2019
Brendon Gill Trustee/Treasurer 26/11/2018
John Pomana Trustee 30/08/2016
Margaret Scratchley Trustee 30/08/2016
Michelle Joy Duley Trustee 30/08/2016
Dorothy Sparrow Trustee 8/12/2014
Sandra Florence Glassford Trustee 11/12/2013
Constance Muriel Jones Trustee 15/08/2011
Leslynne Jackson Trustee 15/08/2011
Trevor Blanchard Trustee 20/12/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/03/2020 NOC013
17/12/2018 NOC010
31/12/2014 NOC006
11/12/2013 NOC005
22/09/2011 NOC003
22/01/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.