pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Operations Research Society of New Zealand Incorporated
ORSNZ
CC40246
9429042795094
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

C/O Anthony Downward, Engineering Science
Private Bag 92019, Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142
C/O DEPT OF ENGINEERING SCIENCE LEVEL 3
70 Symonds Street
Grafton
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Society are the advancement of education through encouraging the extending the knowledge and use of Operations Research techiques by: - Holding meeting for the purpose of reading papers and discussing Operations Research subjects. - Publishing papers of Operations Research. - Encouraging the formation of branches where appropriate. - Such other methods as the Council shall from time to time determine.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Organises research conferences, distributes newsletters and awards student prizes to further education in Operational Research

Education / training / research

General public

Students, Academics, Practitioners and those members of the General Public interested in Operational Research in NZ

Entity Structure

The council shall consist of a President, a Vice-President, an Honorary Secretary, an Honorary Treasurer, and six other members. In addition, not more than five members may be co-opted annually by the Council.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 22/12/2022 $481 $1,150
31/12/2021 20/04/2022 $853 $715
31/12/2020 2/03/2022 $12,883 $17,747
31/12/2019 1/01/2021 $5,132 $1,901
31/12/2018 18/12/2018 $3,094 $4,687
31/12/2017 10/01/2018 $2,664 $32,082
31/12/2016 4/04/2017 $38,548 $2,476
31/12/2015 17/03/2017 $6,036 $2,717
31/12/2014 17/03/2017 $62,853 $63,269

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Thomas Elliott Adams Treasurer 23/03/2022
Michael O'Sullivan President 1/04/2017
Anthony Downward Secretary 1/12/2015
Kevin Ross Council Member 1/12/2012
Andrea Raith Vice President 3/12/2009
Grant Read Canterbury Regional Contact 30/11/2008
Andy Bryan Philpott IFORS Representative 30/11/2007
Antony Paul Bock Rouse Auckland Regional Contact 30/11/2007
Andrew James Mason Council Member 29/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kim Frew Council Member 1/12/2021
Rachael Tappenden Canterbury Regional Contact 1/12/2020
Cameron Walker Auckland Regional Contact 3/12/2018
Geoffrey Pritchard Vice President 3/12/2018
Golbon Zakeri Webmaster 3/12/2018
John Charles Paynter Council Member 1/12/2017
Hector Fernando Beltran-garcia Council Member 1/12/2016
Mark Richard Johnston Council Member 1/12/2014
David Murray Ryan Council Member 1/12/2013
Ross Jonathon William James Council Member 1/12/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/03/2022 NOC013
9/01/2018 NOC009
4/04/2017 NOC007
3/04/2017 NOC006
3/04/2017 NOC005
17/03/2017 NOC004
7/12/2010 AR003
18/11/2009 AR002

Charity Documents