Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tuwharetoa Ki Kawerau Health, Education and Social Services Trust
Tuwharetoa Ki Kawerau Hauora
CC40350
9429042919360
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 262
Kawerau
3169
28-30 Islington Street
Kawerau
3127

Charity's other details

07 323 8025


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust provides quality Health, Education and Social Services within the rohe of Tuwharetoa ki Kawerau and Eastern Bay of Plenty.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research, Social services

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

The Trust Structure consists of seven Trustees appointed by the Stakeholders. A Chairperson is elected by the Trustees annually.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 30/04/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 3/12/2024 $7,124,587 $6,014,427 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 12/01/2023 $6,410,315 $5,349,307 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 20/12/2021 $4,826,218 $3,870,163 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 28/02/2021 8/03/2021 $4,020,199 $3,204,714 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/03/2020 $2,846,928 $2,370,753 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/03/2019 22/04/2019 $2,345,060 $2,008,814 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 31/05/2018 $2,213,501 $2,097,436 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 17/11/2016 $2,121,615 $1,948,651 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 17/11/2015 $2,046,850 $1,894,940 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Carrie Tairua Savage Trustee 26/11/2022
Katishe Aria McCauley Trustee 26/11/2022
Merehira Mamaeroa Savage Trustee 19/12/2020
Phebe Josephine Eruera Trustee 19/12/2020
Dorothy Mareroa Trustee 7/03/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dr. Sneha Jessica Gray Trustee 22/08/2024
Jonathon Te Rire Trustee 28/02/2024
Huia Ann MacDonald Trustee 26/11/2022
June Anne Lewis Trustee 26/11/2022
Sela Kingi Trustee 30/06/2022
Berice Julian Trustee 19/12/2020
Carrie Savage Trustee 19/12/2020
Tamaku Paul Trustee 19/12/2020
Timi Jimmy Peri Trustee 20/12/2019
Grace Stone Trustee 20/12/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/10/2024 NOC024
18/12/2019 NOC019
5/10/2016 NOC015
5/10/2016 NOC014
5/10/2016 NOC013
5/10/2016 NOC012
2/04/2016 NOC011
23/03/2016 NOC010
18/11/2015 NOC009
21/01/2014 NOC008
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.