Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Arohanui Hospice Service Trust
Arohanui Hospice
CC40358
9429042577706
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 5349
Terrace End
Palmerston North
4441
1 Heretaunga Street
Palmerston North
4414

Charity's other details

06 356 6606
06 355 0453


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Group Members


Below are all the members of Arohanui Hospice Service Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Arohanui Hospice Foundation
Arohanui Hospice Service Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Arohanui Hospice provides specialist palliative care services to people of the Manawatu, Horowhenua, Tararua and Rangitikei. Our vision is that all people with life limiting conditions live well and die well irrespective of their condition or care setting.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities, Palliative Care Provider

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Curtis Walker Trustee 1/02/2022
Bryan Guy Trustee 27/07/2021
Knighton Julie Trustee 27/07/2021
David John Andrews Trustee 29/09/2020
Sharon Mary Wards Trustee 29/09/2020
Michelle Anne Connor Director Foundation 28/04/2020
Murray Allan Georgel Trustee 1/11/2016
Lorraine Vincent Chair 1/11/2014
Clare Jane Randall Chief Executive 4/10/2010
John Freebairn Trustee 10/06/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bernard Hanaray Trustee 26/11/2024
Ross Hadwin Trustee 16/07/2024
Lindy Purdy Trustee 28/10/2023
Roger Clausen Trustee 30/11/2021
Fred Hirst Trustee 28/09/2021
Timothy Mordaunt Trustee 25/05/2021
Mary McKenna Trustee 11/09/2019
Charlie Pedersen Deputy Chairman 26/09/2017
Paul Warren Rieger Trustee 18/07/2017
Esther Willis Trustee 6/08/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/12/2024 NOC029
28/11/2024 NOC028
2/12/2021 NOC023
15/10/2021 NOC022
26/05/2021 NOC020
26/05/2021 NOC019
3/01/2020 NOC017
25/02/2019 NOC015
27/02/2017 NOC011
27/02/2017 NOC009
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.