pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Save Animals From Exploitation Incorporated
SAFE for Animals
CC40428
9429042724353
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 5750
Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142

Charity's other details

0800 SAVEANIMALS
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/SAFEnewzealand
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/safenewzealand
https://www.instagram.com/safenewzealand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To prevent the suffering, abuse and exploitation of animals.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Fund-raising

Animals

General public

Entity Structure

SAFE's Board is comprised of six individuals who volunteer their time and skills to help animals and ensure good governance. Our current Board Members come from a diverse range of backgrounds, such as: animal advocacy, marketing, fundraising, leadership, digital media, accountancy and business. SAFE currently has 3,759 registered volunteers, 3,005 financial supporters and many non-financial supporters including businesses and high-profile New Zealand celebrities, along with a dedicated staff .

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 15/09/2021 $1,823,933 $2,114,944
30/09/2020 28/08/2020 $2,206,546 $1,893,408
30/09/2019 16/09/2019 $3,028,193 $1,646,342
30/09/2018 27/08/2018 $6,132,948 $1,672,820
30/09/2017 18/09/2017 $1,464,488 $1,400,808
30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $1,373,950 $1,057,483
30/09/2015 29/10/2015 $1,134,510 $966,614
30/09/2014 20/10/2014 $906,823 $952,143
30/09/2013 14/11/2013 $1,051,239 $981,513
30/09/2012 13/12/2012 $1,390,649 $1,031,939

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Marcelo Rodriguez Ferrere Board member 30/11/2021
Dallas Joy Hopkins Board Member 20/09/2021
Gareth Thomas Llewellyn Hughes Chair 18/10/2020
Logan Peter Smedley Treasurer 2/09/2020
Debra Ashton Chief Executive Officer 1/09/2018
Timothy Groenendaal Board member 24/02/2018
Katharine Birks Secretary 1/08/2017
Kirsten Magnusson Board Member 24/05/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mark Rocket Chair 16/06/2021
Troy Coyle Secretary 6/10/2020
Sarah Barnes Treasurer 17/08/2020
Glen Desmond Real Board Member 1/08/2019
Joanne Caroline Child Treasurer 1/08/2019
Saar Cohen-Ronen Board Member 1/08/2019
Marieke Jasmijn de Boo CEO 26/05/2018
Brett Matthew Lahman Board member 1/12/2017
Melanie Vivian Board Member 24/10/2017
Clare Justine Marks Head of Operations 31/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/11/2021 NOC050
23/11/2021 NOC049
19/11/2021 NOC048
13/10/2021 NOC047
7/07/2021 NOC045
16/06/2021 NOC044
1/06/2021 NOC043
21/11/2020 NOC042
10/11/2020 NOC041
28/04/2020 NOC038

Charity Documents