Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Waikato Chapter of Barbershop Harmony New Zealand Incorporated
Mighty River Harmony
CC40569
9429042712381
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Waikato Chapter of the New Zealand Association of Barbershop Singers Incorporated 30/06/2008
The Waikato Chapter of Barbershop Harmony New Zealand Incorporated 11/11/2014

Address for service

120 Tamahere Drive
RD 3
Tamahere
Hamilton
3283

Charity's other details

027 4858 662
www.facebook.com/MightyRiverHarmony


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objectives of the Chapter are: a) to preserve and promote barbershop singing b) to promote public awareness and appreciation of barbershop chorus and group harmony singing and to entertain the public c) to encourage, educate and practice members in vocal and musical skills d) to establish and maintain good fellowship among members e) to support, financially or otherwise, charities and ventures approved by the Board within New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Chorus, young singers in harmony), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Chapter is governed by a board consisting of a President, Vice President, Secretary, Treasurer and any other such officers as may be deemed necessary by the Chapter to conduct its affairs. Each member of the Board shall be an active member of the Chapter.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 31/03/2009 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filling their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 31/03/2010.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 31/03/2024 29/12/2023 $25,329 $31,334 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2022 31/03/2023 28/11/2022 $13,188 $15,465 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2021 31/03/2022 28/11/2021 $32,747 $30,112 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2020 31/03/2021 7/01/2021 $14,421 $14,269 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2019 31/03/2020 20/02/2020 $28,779 $23,003 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2018 31/03/2019 18/02/2019 $17,465 $26,272 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2017 31/03/2018 24/03/2018 $31,045 $32,231 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2016 31/03/2017 25/03/2017 $40,747 $26,580 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2015 31/03/2016 21/05/2016 $20,070 $24,152 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/09/2014 31/03/2015 13/03/2015 $36,393 $37,389 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brian Andrew Hayward Jones Treasurer 24/10/2023
Christopher Godfrey Secretary 24/10/2023
Robert Epiha President 24/10/2023

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Arthur Whitfield Secretary 24/10/2023
Geoffrey Richard Bentley President 24/10/2023
Howard Christopher Ettema Treasurer 24/10/2023
Nathan Harper Vice President 24/10/2023
Mark Smith Secretary 1/04/2022
Desmond Botting Secretary 31/10/2021
Warwick McWha Vice President 31/10/2021
John Kim Treasurer 3/11/2020
Brian Jones Secretary 30/09/2018
Michael McCurry Vice President 31/10/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/01/2024 NOC025
26/01/2024 NOC024
26/01/2024 NOC023
28/11/2022 NOC019
28/11/2021 NOC017
31/10/2021 NOC016
9/04/2018 NOC010
30/04/2016 NOC007
25/01/2015 NOC005
15/02/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.