Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St John Of God Health Care Incorporated
CC40675
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

P O Box 5753
St Georges Terrace
Perth
Western Australia
6831
Level 1
556 Wellington Street
Perth
Western Australia
6000

Charity's other details

+618 6116 0731

Oceania

Australia


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

St John of God Health Care (SJGHC) pursued its charitable purpose during the last financial year in Australia via the operation of hospitals and home nursing. In New Zealand SJGHC pursued its charitable purpose via providing rental accommodation and support to its New Zealand entity.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
ACN 003 667 696 (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
ACN 071 236 176 (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Dencross Pty Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Marillac Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
St John of God Berwick Health Campus (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
St John of God Foundation Inc (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
St John of God Foundation Trust (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
St John Of God Hauora Trust CC25633
St John of God Hawkesbury District Health Service (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
St John of God Midland Health Campus Ltd (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
St John of God Outreach Services (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 16/12/2024 $2,096,372,000 $2,139,147,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 23/01/2024 $2,052,036,000 $2,168,051,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 30/11/2022 $2,007,839,000 $2,025,330,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 6/12/2021 $2,017,814,000 $1,988,140,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 10/12/2020 $1,853,154,000 $1,858,775,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/08/2020 24/08/2020 $1,803,423,000 $1,783,949,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 10/12/2018 $1,707,753,000 $1,674,623,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 27/11/2017 $193,717 $735,442 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 30/01/2017 $196,598 $406,688 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $207,571 $376,381 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Christian Scatena Director 8/04/2024
Julie Elizabeth Keene Director 1/01/2024
Peter Reid Bremner Director 5/09/2023
Shelley Marie Park Director 1/01/2022
Mark O'Brien Director 1/01/2020
Kerry Gaye Sanderson Director 1/05/2018
James Francis McMahon Director 1/07/2017
John Francis Xavier de Groot Director 1/11/2016
Michael Levitt Director 1/01/2015
Peter Prendeville Board Member 13/03/2012
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Adrian Arundell Director 8/04/2024
Justin Mark Carroll Director 29/11/2023
Shane Kelly Director 9/12/2022
Julie Caldecott Director 31/12/2021
Anthony Howarth Director 31/05/2018
Michael Stanford Director 22/03/2018
Mark Bahen Director 31/12/2017
Robert Ian Knowles Director 31/12/2017
Tony Howarth Director 30/06/2016
Linda Ferrington Board Member 3/04/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/01/2013 AR006
29/11/2010 AR003
23/11/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.