pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Gift Trust
CC40774
9429043100934
Registered

Registration details

10/06/2009
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Prometheus Donor Advised Charitable Giving Trust 11/06/2009
Prometheus Gift Trust 1/04/2010
The Gift Trust 18/03/2015

Address for service

PO Box 19120
Marion Square
Te Aro
Wellington
6141
3 MacDonald Crescent
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 391 4438


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Gift Trust's mission is to simplify generosity, to make good happen. We provide personalised giving plans and named 'Gift Accounts' for donors who want to make larger donations to charitable causes. Our Gift Accounts allow donors to give with more confidence and deeper effect, helping them to grow and manage their charitable donations in a strategic and thoughtful way.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Economic development

General public

Other charities

Entity Structure

The Gift Trust has a governance board of trustees who oversee the strategic direction of The Gift Trust. The Gift Trust employ staff to provide management and operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/11/2022 5/12/2022 $7,398,428 $2,016,262
30/09/2021 15/06/2021 $4,332,546 $2,909,679
30/09/2020 4/06/2020 $1,202,693 $862,783
30/09/2019 21/06/2019 $1,119,367 $709,038
30/09/2018 18/05/2018 $1,546,516 $484,082
30/09/2017 8/06/2017 $326,843 $376,060
30/09/2016 3/05/2016 $199,791 $305,231
30/09/2015 2/07/2015 $247,435 $332,284
30/09/2014 22/09/2014 $118,908 $38,243

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Philip John Paul Prendergast Trustee 23/08/2021
Simone Antoinette Robbers Trustee 23/08/2021
Alanna Simone Irving Trustee 9/01/2019
Annette Elizabeth Culpan Trustee 9/01/2019
Anake Angus Murray Goodall Trustee 10/05/2016
Philip McKinstry Chair 9/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
George David Woods Trustee 23/11/2021
Glen Saunders Trustee 8/06/2021
Doris Marianne Zuur Trustee 31/12/2018
Susan Barker Trustee 3/01/2016
Susan Patricia Cooper Trustee 2/08/2013
Duncan John Power Trustee 19/12/2011
Noel Josephson Trustee 19/12/2011
Otto Ernest Friedrich Mengedoht Trustee 2/08/2011
Roy Peter Boonen Trustee 16/12/2009
Terry John Creighton Trustee 16/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/04/2022 NOC029
20/04/2022 NOC028
20/04/2022 NOC027
8/03/2022 NOC026
23/11/2021 NOC025
24/08/2021 NOC024
17/02/2021 NOC022
15/08/2019 NOC020
23/05/2019 NOC018
3/01/2019 NOC017

Charity Documents