pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


NZ Mountain Safety Council Incorporated
MSC
CC40852
9429042793458
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 6027
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
Level 1
29 Brandon St
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 3857162
04 3857366
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/NZMSC
Twitter icon image
twitter.com/nz_msc


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Enabling people to enjoy their outdoors recreation safely.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

MSC has 26 Council Member Organizations who all have a vested interest in safety in the outdoors. MSC is governed by an Executive Committee (Board) appointed by the Council. The Executive Committee appoints the CEO, who then employs Council staff. The senior leadership team consists of the CEO and Operations Manager.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 12/10/2021 $2,269,133 $2,139,259
31/12/2020 6/12/2020 $1,716,514 $1,742,454
31/12/2019 21/11/2019 $2,032,931 $1,884,576
31/12/2018 21/11/2018 $1,940,487 $1,796,112
31/12/2017 27/11/2017 $1,982,590 $1,773,056
31/12/2016 22/02/2017 $1,827,337 $1,738,024
31/12/2015 21/03/2016 $2,305,615 $2,830,455
31/12/2014 21/12/2014 $2,252,660 $2,316,462
31/12/2013 22/11/2013 $2,518,401 $2,569,104
31/12/2012 16/11/2012 $2,397,185 $2,404,278

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Candice Johanson Board Member 17/12/2020
Leigh Matheson Board Member 17/12/2020
Carl McOnie Board Member 1/11/2019
Karen Leacock Board Member 17/10/2019
Richard Davies Deputy Chair 31/10/2018
Nicholas Patrick Brown Chair 4/10/2016
Michael Daisley Chief Executive 20/01/2014
Murray Douglas Board Member 11/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jen Riley Board Member 10/12/2021
Sam Newton Board Member 10/12/2021
Peter Kreft Board Member 17/12/2020
Ross Meder Board Member 17/12/2020
Geoff Ensor Chair 31/10/2018
Fiona Mcdonald Deputy Chair 22/05/2018
Rachael Moore Board Member 27/10/2017
Christopher Paul Scahill Boardmember 28/10/2016
Richard Brodie Business Manager 29/08/2014
Christeen Mackenzie Business Manager 11/10/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/03/2022 NOC016
11/03/2022 NOC015
22/09/2021 NOC013
7/12/2020 NOC011
21/03/2016 NOC006
3/12/2013 NOC005
16/11/2012 AR005
17/11/2011 AR004
4/07/2010 AR002

Charity Documents