Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Runanga O Taumarere Ki Rakaumangamanga
Te Runanga O Taumarere
CC41012
9429043070800
Registered

Registration details

14/08/2020
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
Registered 14/08/2020
De-registered 11/03/2019 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 22/06/2009

Address for service

255 Rawhiti Road
Rawhiti
Russell
0184

Charity's other details

021716132


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori, Ownership

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust is established for purposes beneficial to Taumarere Ki Rakaumangamanga(but without limitation) as follows: a)To promote and develop the cultural, socialand economic advancement of Taumarere ki Rakaumangamanga. b) To promote and provide education of whatsoever nature suited to the particular needs of Taumarere Ki Rakaumangamanga, including( but without limitation) to promote and foster the advancement of education that ensures the conservation of ecology, tikanga,history and spiri

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Marae on Māori reservation land

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $502,819 $487,331 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 3/10/2023 $514,669 $460,666 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 3/11/2022 $367,314 $223,892 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 12/10/2021 $97,628 $40,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 22/10/2015 $42,049 $27,019 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 2/10/2014 $48,946 $33,945 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/03/2013 30/09/2013 4/10/2013 $47,494 $13,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/03/2012 30/09/2012 8/10/2012 $74,806 $15,962 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 30/09/2011 $39,000 $20,547 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Whiti Te Mutunga Henare Hoori Trustee19 19/11/2020
Debra May Rewiri Trustee 26/06/2020
Howard William Gabrielle Reti Trustee 18/06/2020
Peter Thomas Johnson Trustee /Treasurer 19/03/2020
Russell Hook Trustee 1/04/2015
Robert Willoughby Trustee 21/08/2010
Whakatau Joseph George Trustee 23/06/2009
Moses Richard Witehira Trustee 8/06/2006
William Bristowe officer 8/06/2006

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kara George Trustee 4/10/2021
Maxine Khrona Shortland Trustee 24/03/2021
Diane Joy Titio-salive Trustee 18/05/2019
Lorraine Young Secretary/Treasurer 20/02/2019
Ernest Clive Arlidge Trustee 18/05/2018
Vicki Hamilton Trustee 31/03/2014
Willow Prime Trustee 31/03/2013
Rangingangana Hamilton Trustee 31/03/2012
Murray Tauri Trustee 24/09/2011
Lorraine Anne Young Secretary/Treasurer/Trustee 21/09/2011
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2024 NOC016
13/10/2020 NOC012
4/10/2013 AR006
8/10/2012 AR005
10/10/2011 NOC005
30/09/2011 AR003
22/09/2011 NOC004
22/09/2011 NOC003
22/09/2011 NOC002
30/09/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.