Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Netherlands Society (Waikato) Incorporated
CC41117
9429042704997
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

42 Taylor Street
Cambridge
3434

Charity's other details

07-8279395
NZ Netherlands Society (Waikato) Inc


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the Dutch language and culture with people in the Waikato. Any funds received are used for the purpose of supporting and promoting Dutch culture in the Waikato.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Preserving Dutch Culture in the Waikato region / Cultural Support / Awareness), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Arts / culture / heritage

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

General public, Migrants / refugees, People of Dutch Decent

Entity Structure

The Society support affiliated clubs which are not accountable to the NZ Netherlands Society (Waikato), however, the Society may choose to financially support these organisations. Committee members are appointed by its members at the Annual General Meeting and have the day to day responsibility for the functioning of the Society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/02/2024 $6,347 $6,284 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 1/02/2024 $7,009 $7,392 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 25/08/2022 $4,780 $8,312 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 25/07/2021 $7,459 $5,677 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 3/07/2019 $5,849 $6,761 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 3/07/2019 $5,131 $6,205 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 26/04/2018 $4,910 $11,946 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 19/02/2017 $5,410 $7,461 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 19/02/2017 $7,908 $12,253 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Welan Rorimpandey committee member 4/08/2018
Gunther Hollman Committee Member 2/07/2016
Auk TerVeen Committee Member 25/04/2015
Lisa Merts Treasurer 25/04/2015
Yolande van Gaalen-Sloet Secretary 25/04/2015
Louise Van Den Berg President 15/06/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wendy Jane van den Berg committee member 18/05/2019
Anneke Bloemink committee member 19/05/2018
Hennie van Kooten Committee Member 7/01/2018
Mary Bethel Committee member 29/04/2017
Cornelia Anna Maria Kanters Committee Member 25/04/2015
Sophia van den Boogaard committee member 25/04/2015
Thomas Beuker committee member 25/04/2015
Cornelius Zegwaard Treasurer 28/05/2011
Greet Van Der Helm Secretary 10/06/2010
Mathias Wilhelmus Van Vugt Committee Member 10/06/2010
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/07/2019 NOC013
1/10/2018 NOC011
3/11/2017 NOC009
19/02/2017 NOC008
19/02/2017 NOC006
22/09/2013 AR006
21/10/2012 AR005
15/01/2012 AR004
19/06/2010 AR003
5/10/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.