Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tuwharetoa Health Charitable Trust
CC41478
9429043076291
Registered

Registration details

21/07/2009
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 326
Turangi
3353
28 Te Rangitautahanga Road
Turangi
3334

Charity's other details

07 384 2882
07 384 7550


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Tuwharetoa Health is a kaupapa Māori health provider delivering a range of services to the Turangi, Taupo and Mangakino communities. Our vision to improve the health of all those who reside in the rohe of Ngāti Tūwharetoa are guided by the values of whanaungatanga and manaakitanga. Provides services, advice, information and advocacy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Employment, People with disabilities

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

THCT is a charitable trust that is governed by a Board of Trustees that the CEO reports to. There are four main strands of the organisation; Whanau Engagement Team, Whanau Care and Independence Team, Whanau Pepi and Tamariki Team and Operations Team. The CEO and the team managers are part of the Executive Management Team.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 19/12/2024 $7,375,644 $6,579,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 22/12/2023 $6,246,888 $5,394,402 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 26/02/2023 $7,475,440 $5,458,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 9/01/2022 $5,448,078 $4,250,764 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/01/2021 9/02/2021 $3,790,737 $3,532,783 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 18/12/2019 $3,389,849 $3,265,947 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 4/12/2018 $3,393,327 $2,940,199 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 22/02/2018 $2,363,226 $2,444,112 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 8/12/2016 $2,272,913 $2,317,722 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/11/2015 $2,103,630 $2,067,808 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Hemopo Trustee 1/07/2023
David Brian Nixon Trustee 9/12/2021
Fredrick Robert Kereopa Chairperson 9/12/2021
Wilhelmina Salvador CEO 4/07/2017
Emily Tamepo Trustee 1/07/2017
Te Takinga New Trustee 1/07/2017
Ian Farquhar Trustee 1/08/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Denis William Greenslade Trustee 30/06/2022
John Ngataiehura Hepi Trustee 30/10/2018
Tesa Meihana Trustee 10/08/2017
Douglas Gartner Trustee 30/06/2017
Justine Pereka Trustee 30/06/2016
Tongawhiti Manuirirangi Trustee 31/12/2013
Dylan Tahau Trustee 1/03/2013
Susan Elizabeth Te Heu Heu Trustee 19/03/2012
Danny Aperahama Loughlin Trustee 31/07/2011
Judy Ngapera Harris Trustee 31/07/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/10/2023 NOC018
9/12/2021 NOC015
22/02/2019 NOC012
10/08/2017 NOC008
4/11/2016 NOC006
19/01/2015 NOC005
29/11/2013 NOC004
4/10/2012 NOC001
8/12/2011 AR003
20/04/2011 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.