Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


International Buddhist Association of New Zealand (South Island) Incorporated
CC41568
9429042621928
Registered

Registration details

27/07/2009
March 31

Address for service

2 Harakeke Street
Riccarton
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 341 6276


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

IBA is an organisation of monastic and lay Buddhists in which Humanistic Buddhism is practiced in everyday life. It is essentially an embodiment of cultivation that entails the participation in Dharma services and activities that are beneficial to society at large, with its religious characteristics and the essence of education and cultural activities. Our mission is to apply tenets of Humanistic Buddhism to benefit the society though promoting education, raising gender equality, providing medical services and emergency relief, and supporting environmental sustainability.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Education

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 11/10/2024 $1,397,066 $1,103,973 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 9/08/2023 $1,675,235 $1,055,157 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 5/09/2022 $1,667,256 $927,085 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 28/02/2021 1/09/2021 $1,254,553 $1,064,093 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $1,829,615 $1,200,674 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $1,635,643 $745,353 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/09/2017 $1,624,510 $606,779 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 3/08/2016 $519,958 $919,006 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 5/10/2015 $1,076,011 $480,032 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Qian Cao Treasurer 1/01/2024
Jee Chin Lim President 1/07/2009
Yueh Liang Yen Secretary 1/07/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kok Wei Low Treasurer 31/12/2023
Siew Chun Lee Treasurer 1/01/2022
Pau Yen Teng Treasurer 31/08/2019
Foo Cheh NG Committee Member 30/03/2019
Hue Gia TRINH Committee Member 31/01/2019
Mei-Lee LO Committee Member 31/12/2018
Selina Chi Ling Leung Committee Member 30/06/2018
Soke Leng Wong committee member 30/06/2018
Feng-Min Cheng Committee Member 31/01/2018
Tsai Fang Tsai Committee Member 20/11/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/07/2024 NOC018
19/05/2022 NOC013
24/09/2019 NOC010
30/09/2018 NOC009
5/10/2013 NOC003
15/12/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.