Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Ngaruahine Iwi Authority
Ngaruahine Iwi Health Service
CC41599
9429042672487
Deregistered
17/05/2018
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Ngaruahine Iwi Authority at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 17/05/2018 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 42
Manaia
4641
16 Tauranga-A-Ika Street
Manaia
4612

Charity's other details

06 274 8047
06 274 8043


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides health and social services to the Ngaruahine uri and wider community of South Taranaki.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Accommodation / housing, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Ngaruahine Iwi Authority has a board duly elected as representatives of Ngaruahine Hapu. Board then employs staff and volunteers to facilitate the services within operational means

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 18/03/2018 $188,813 $205,660 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 20/12/2016 $210,586 $210,576 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 26/05/2015 $237,519 $262,855 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2013 30/09/2013 26/05/2015 $176,441 $189,027 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2012 30/09/2012 27/02/2014 $208,319 $163,441 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 29/09/2011 $151,675 $158,166 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2010 30/09/2010 7/10/2010 $171,098 $187,054 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2009 30/09/2009 13/09/2009 $279,000 $687,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rangiroa Rongonui Board Trustee 20/01/2018
William Hooker Board Member 9/02/2016
Tama Turahui Board Member 8/02/2016
Te Oti George Katene Board Member 1/01/2012
Hori Keterangi Manuirirangi Chairperson 1/07/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Pamela Hinewai Morehu-wharepapa Trustee 18/08/2016
Kenny Rei Board Member 12/07/2016
Te Wehi Takamori Board Member 8/02/2016
Tarawara Weston Trustee 29/04/2015
Mana Jenkins Board Member 1/10/2013
Marylinda Ngati Brooks Board Member 7/08/2013
John Henry Hooker Trustee/Chairman 1/08/2013
Pricilla Olive Rei Board Member 1/07/2013
Peter Moeahu - 28/11/2012
Tango Tango Ivy Kearney Board Member 1/05/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/02/2014 NOC007
20/08/2013 NOC004
24/05/2011 NOC003
13/05/2011 NOC002
7/10/2010 AR003
13/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.