Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ruapani Ki Waikaremoana Trust
Lake Whakamarino Lodge
CC41864
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

Hostel Lane
Tuai
RD 5
Wairoa
4195

Charity's other details

06 837 3876
https://www.facebook.com/profile.php?id=100088548766897


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae, Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide for the relief of poverty and education for the beneficiaries

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Promotes tourism

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Employment, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Ngati Ruapani

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/11/2024 $423,185 $375,278 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/06/2023 $313,748 $279,035 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 26/09/2022 $322,318 $201,833 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 18/01/2021 $31,895,200 $318,223 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 3/06/2020 $297,810 $294,350 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 10/09/2019 $241,597 $264,631 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 23/08/2018 $253,227 $225,225 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 23/08/2018 $169,719 $207,201 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lani Turipa Trustee Treasurer 28/11/2024
Te Iwa Makere Tamaki Trustee Chairperson 28/11/2024
Carl Anderson Trustee 6/09/2024
TImoti Rurehe Trustee 6/09/2024
Waylon Waiwai Trustee 6/09/2024

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Benita Tracy Cairns Trustee Secretary 6/09/2024
Hiria Waiwai Waiwai Trustee 6/09/2024
Mark-Shane Tuuta-Rurehe Trustee Treasurer 6/09/2024
Parehuia Eparaima Trustee 6/09/2024
Tahoka Pere Tuahine Trustee Chairperson 6/09/2024
Angela Gay Waimatao Maria Appleby-Smith Trustee 1/05/2021
Sharee Lane Hemingway Trustee 1/05/2021
James Anthony Waiwai Trustee 1/11/2020
Karlite Nona Rangihau Trustee 1/11/2020
Catherine Riripeti Haley Paine Trustee 31/10/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2024 NOC017
10/11/2021 NOC012
21/06/2021 NOC011
23/12/2015 NOC004
7/11/2011 AR004
9/03/2011 AR003
8/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.