Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Social Innovation Trust
CC41918
9429043202362
Deregistered
25/05/2014
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has wound up.

Below are details of Social Innovation Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

26/08/2009
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 25/05/2014 This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has wound up.
Registered 26/08/2009

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Te Wai Pounamu Foundation Trust 27/08/2009
Social Innovation Trust 15/12/2010

Address for service

C/- Flat 4
88 Eglinton Road
Mornington
Dunedin
9011
85 Albany Street
North Dunedin
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 337 9328


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Promotion of volunteering

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, Care / protection of animals, Economic development, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/03/2012 30/09/2012 19/12/2012 $148,914 $122,795 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 22/12/2011 $181,769 $162,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2010 30/09/2010 24/12/2010 $39,308 $36,392 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2009 30/09/2009 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Rohan Trustee (Treasurer) 12/04/2012
Lisa Perry Trustee 1/04/2011
Tiaki Latham-coates Trustee 4/03/2011
Guy Ryan Trustee 7/08/2009
Louis Brown Chairperson 7/08/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mark Prain Trustee 15/08/2011
Nicole Mccrossin Trustee 15/03/2011
Zane Smith West Coast Convener 15/12/2010
Celia Neilson Staff 22/09/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2012 NOC010
20/05/2012 NOC009
29/09/2011 NOC008
15/03/2011 NOC007
24/12/2010 AR002
15/12/2010 NOC006
23/09/2010 NOC005
27/07/2010 NOC004
3/05/2010 NOC003
26/04/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.