Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Muddy Creek Riders Incorporated
CC42402
9429043054008
Deregistered
23/02/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Muddy Creek Riders Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

29/09/2009
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 23/02/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 29/09/2009

Address for service

436B Huia Road
Laingholm
Auckland
604
436b Huia Road
Laingholm
Auckland
604

Charity's other details

09 8153907


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Care / protection of animals, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, General public


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2013 30/09/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/03/2012 30/09/2012 15/01/2013 $23,991 $24,209 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 12/09/2011 $27,941 $27,141 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2010 30/09/2010 23/09/2010 $33,794 $35,679 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rian Kier Morgan-Smith Secretary 1/08/2013
Christina Birkin Treasurer 19/02/2013
Isabel Marcelle Carlisle Youth Committee Member 4/08/2012
Louise Matthews President 4/08/2012
Sue Crossan Committee Member 4/08/2012
Robyn Bevan committee Member 3/09/2011
Natasha Nipper comittee member 16/10/2010
Tania Bellugue committee 16/10/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andy Wisheart Committee Member 1/09/2013
Tanya Garcia Treasurer 27/02/2013
Janine Clayton committee 14/02/2013
Sonya Robson Treasurer 24/12/2012
Christopher John Nipper secretrary 4/08/2012
Erin Ashe committee 4/08/2012
Jennifier Breen Committee Member 4/08/2012
Marissa Snykers committee 4/08/2012
Elizabeth Henrica Weenink Committee Member 22/05/2011
Andrea Haydon Committee member 16/10/2010
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/02/2013 NOC005
27/09/2012 NOC004
27/09/2012 NOC003
12/09/2011 AR003
31/10/2010 NOC002
23/09/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.