Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Aoraki Foundation
CC42601
9429043226122
Registered

Registration details

15/10/2009
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 983
Timaru
7940
27 Strathallan Street
Timaru
7910

Charity's other details

03 687 7363
https://www.facebook.com/aorakifoundation/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Aoraki Foundation is a community foundation that seeks to inspire and strengthen our community through giving. We achieve that by: 1. Educating our community on the benefits of philanthropy. 2. Working with the professional advisors in our community to encourage bequests that will benefit the Aoraki/South Canterbury region. 3. Managing endowment funds to ensure that we achieve the best possible return on our investment. 4. Distributing income from our endowment funds to worthwhile charitable projects and causes within the Aoraki/South Canterbury region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Grants to community groups & organisations - cultural etc, sporting/heritage

Community development

Health, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development

Other charities

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 24/11/2024 $1,323,796 $624,515 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 21/11/2023 $2,396,548 $1,999,897 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 7/12/2022 $653,442 $356,357 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/03/2022 28/03/2022 $1,176,815 $599,482 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/03/2021 23/03/2021 $606,961 $312,513 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 24/10/2019 $1,043,424 $223,390 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 10/12/2018 $513,072 $201,825 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 21/02/2018 $452,988 $445,490 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 22/11/2016 $388,196 $238,966 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 28/10/2015 $457,783 $231,740 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Martin Gregan Trustee 16/10/2023
Georgina Charlotte Hamilton Trustee 30/06/2023
Claire Louise Barlow Trustee 20/07/2022
Dale Charles Walden Trustee 20/07/2022
Jo Goodhew Trustee 9/03/2022
Anthony John Alden Trustee 17/08/2021
Greg Anderson Trustee 20/07/2021
Jennifer Lee Carter-Bolitho Trustee 20/04/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anne-Cecile Delwaide Trustee 27/08/2023
Andrew McRae Trustee 30/06/2023
Robbie Moginie Trustee 20/10/2022
Andrew Mark Laming Trustee 21/06/2022
Anna Wheeler Trustee 9/03/2022
Rene Crawford Trustee 9/03/2022
Leoma du Toit Trustee 1/10/2021
Robyn Florence Hewson Trustee 3/09/2021
John Coles Trustee 20/04/2021
Mark Kroening Trustee 20/04/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/11/2023 NOC040
11/07/2023 NOC039
31/10/2022 NOC037
29/07/2022 NOC035
26/07/2022 NOC034
23/05/2022 NOC031
6/10/2021 NOC029
20/07/2021 NOC028
15/07/2021 NOC027
28/05/2021 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.