pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Public Health Action Limited
Mātauranga Medical
CC42614
9429031907088
Registered

Registration details

18/10/2009
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Public Health Nutrition Limited 19/10/2009
Public Health Action Limited 12/12/2017

Address for service

41 Glenbervie Terrace
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0275778867


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Services to public health

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research

Education / training / research

Health

General public

Entity Structure

Limited Company with shares held in trust on behalf of the NZ public by directors

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 31/12/2022 $0 $0
31/12/2021 22/03/2022 $137,904 $130,463
31/12/2020 25/02/2021 $0 $6,785
31/12/2019 25/02/2021 $3,288 $1,142
31/12/2018 17/03/2019 $40 $40
31/12/2017 12/12/2017 $45 $45
31/12/2016 12/12/2017 $1,250 $1,254
31/12/2015 2/04/2016 $45 $56
31/12/2014 7/09/2014 $27 $13
31/12/2013 7/09/2014 $0 $3,232

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Karl Geiringer Director 17/09/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/12/2021 NOC015
28/11/2016 NOC007
29/01/2013 AR007
24/02/2012 AR006

Charity Documents