Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Nga Kairauhii
Nga Kairauhii Charitable Trust
CC43772
9429042977575
Deregistered
22/12/2014
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Nga Kairauhii at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

9/03/2010
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 22/12/2014 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 9/03/2010

Address for service

305 Omahu Road
Frimley
Hastings
4120
PO Box 2391
Stortford Lodge
Hastings
4153

Charity's other details

06 8760097
06 8735279


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Marae on reservation land

Health, Social services

Family / whanau

Older people, People with disabilities


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 28/08/2012 $145,353 $215,955 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 - - - To be filed To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annette Nuku 01 April 2011 1/04/2011
Narina Tumarae Trustee 1/03/2010
Olive Aranui Proxy member 13/08/2009
Marama Tiakitai Trustee 25/03/2009
Lovey Edwards Trustee 18/02/2008
Mere Poi Trustee 17/05/2006
Anne Hakiwai Trustee 5/05/2003
Ruku Areta Te Huia Trustee 16/11/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mane Adams Trustee 1/07/2012
Lisa Tuhi Trustee 1/04/2012
Tatu Pineaha Trustee 1/01/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/07/2012 AR001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.