Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Rosebank School Parent Teacher Association (PTA)
CC43809
N/A
Deregistered
15/02/2015
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Rosebank School Parent Teacher Association (PTA) at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/03/2010
December 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 15/02/2015 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 15/03/2010

Address for service

217 Rosebank Road
Avondale
Auckland
1026

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2012 30/06/2013 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2011 30/06/2012 29/08/2012 $2,018 $1,802 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2010 30/06/2011 29/06/2011 $6,397 $4,395 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Aubrey Williams Chairperson 27/08/2012
Elisa Niovara Treasurer 27/08/2012
Juressa Lee Secretary 27/08/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anna Aukino Secretary 27/08/2012
Kathy Scott Treasurer 27/08/2012
Nipu Tetini Chairperson 27/08/2012
Tremain Harawira Parent Representative Treasurer 27/08/2012
Lani Latu Treasurer 23/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/08/2012 AR003
27/08/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.