Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pohutukawa Coast Bike Club Incorporated
CC43932
9429043203130
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2010
March 31

Address for service

45 Maraetai Heights Road
Maraetai
Auckland
2018

Charity's other details

021 555 392


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mountain biking club in Maraetai / Whitford

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Mountain biking club in Maraetai / Whitford)

Sport / recreation

Environment / conservation

General public

Children / young people

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 28/08/2024 $96,595 $106,067 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 20/08/2023 $128,315 $154,884 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 4/09/2022 $225,935 $234,102 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 14/07/2021 $120,487 $67,287 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $109,700 $134,976 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 25/09/2019 $38,551 $35,306 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 14/09/2018 $43,950 $34,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $24,990 $37,226 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $58,004 $59,078 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Clint Davies committee member 1/04/2024
Rodger Shepherd Treasurer 1/04/2016
Mandy McDavitt Secretary 31/05/2015
Callum Wilson President 28/04/2015
Brent Raynor Committee member 1/11/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Steve Kershaw Committee Member 31/07/2024
Marcus Davies-King Committee Member 31/03/2024
Nigel McCreight Committee Member 1/06/2021
Nick Coyne Committee member 1/01/2018
Arlene Marie Rayner Treasurer 1/04/2017
Mike Curwood Committee Member 1/04/2016
Chris Brown Committee Member 31/05/2015
Lee Russell Committee Member 31/05/2015
Matthew Tremlett Secretary 31/05/2014
Bill Hewitt Committee Member 7/05/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/06/2024 NOC016
4/04/2022 NOC012
3/06/2015 NOC004
22/08/2012 AR003
2/09/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.