Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Tirohia Te Kopere Trust
Opotiki Mental Health Support Centre
CC44010
9429042931935
Deregistered
04/06/2015
Service of the NOITR has been attempted by both post and email – both have been returned as undeliverable. The entity has not met its obligations under section 40(1)(b) to notify Charities Services of a change in service address. Our current approach is to deregister entities after attempting service via both of these means. The entity is being deregistered for failure to file more than two annual returns (considered a ground for removal under section 32(b)).

Below are details of Tirohia Te Kopere Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/04/2010
July 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 4/06/2015 Service of the NOITR has been attempted by both post and email – both have been returned as undeliverable. The entity has not met its obligations under section 40(1)(b) to notify Charities Services of a change in service address. Our current approach is to deregister entities after attempting service via both of these means. The entity is being deregistered for failure to file more than two annual returns (considered a ground for removal under section 32(b)).
Registered 15/04/2010

Address for service

PO Box 287
Opotiki
3162
84 Wellington Street
Opotiki
3122

Charity's other details

(07) 315 5629
(07) 315 5862


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Adult Peer Support and Advocacy for Tangata Whai ora

Health

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(People living with a mental illness in the community), Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2014 31/01/2015 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/07/2013 31/01/2014 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/07/2012 31/01/2013 22/11/2012 $160,318 $157,236 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2011 31/01/2012 19/09/2012 $155,678 $174,413 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/07/2010 31/01/2011 26/09/2011 $158,398 $142,653 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Wilfried Schutz Trustee 1/05/2008
Sue Crarer Trustee 1/06/2005
Andrew Taylor Trustee 1/12/2004
Lynda Ihe Trustee 1/04/2000
Peggy Pahuru Chairperson 18/06/1997
Christina Degendorfer Trustee/Manager 21/05/1997

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gary Newth Trustee 17/02/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/11/2012 AR005
30/08/2012 AR004
26/09/2011 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.