Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bowel Cancer New Zealand
Bowel Cancer Aotearoa Charitable Trust; Beat Bowel Cancer Aotearoa; Beat Bowel Cancer New Zealand; BBCA; BBCNZ; BCNZ
CC44166
9429050834617
Registered

Registration details

10/05/2010
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Beat Bowel Cancer Aotearoa Incorporated 11/05/2010
Bowel Cancer New Zealand Incorporated 16/04/2015
Bowel Cancer Aotearoa Charitable Trust 31/03/2023
Bowel Cancer New Zealand 2/04/2025

Address for service

PO Box 301517
Albany
Auckland
0752
C/- Hudson Gavin Martin
Level 16, 45 Queen Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/BCNZ.org.nz/
https://twitter.com/BowelCancerNZ


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To reduce the impact of bowel cancer on New Zealand communities through awareness, education, support and research.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(People affected by Bowel Cancer), Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 31/10/2024 29/11/2024 $951,704 $938,746 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 31/10/2023 26/10/2023 $1,047,947 $875,260 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/11/2022 $923,812 $714,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 17/11/2021 $470,957 $410,694 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 19/10/2020 $491,918 $408,922 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $290,443 $267,704 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 17/10/2018 $193,318 $177,370 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $187,775 $187,019 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $262,897 $205,241 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the financial period between 1 April 2024- 31 December 2024 (9 months) due to a balance date change

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Huskinson Chief Executive 10/10/2024
Edward Watson Trustee 17/09/2024
Michael Killick Trustee 17/09/2024
Jemma Balmer Trustee 30/08/2023
Linda Faulkner Trustee 30/08/2023
Annika Lim Trustee / Secretary 28/08/2018
Stefan Corbett Trustee / Chair 28/08/2018
Kevin Jones Trustee / Treasurer 17/10/2017
Rachel Afeaki Trustee 17/10/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rebekah Heal General Manager 26/09/2024
Sarah Louise Derrett Trustee 30/06/2024
Louisa Graham Trustee / Secretary 23/08/2023
Peter Kenrick Krijger Executive Committee Member 1/03/2022
Trisha Cooney Executive Committee Member 20/11/2021
Kimberly Tall Administrator 14/01/2019
Garath Roberts Chairperson 2/10/2018
Nicola Russell Executive Committee Member 2/10/2018
Rachel Holdaway Executive Committee Member 2/10/2018
Rachel Afeaki-Taumoepeau Executive Committee Member 17/10/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/05/2025 NOC040
2/04/2025 NOC039
23/10/2024 NOC037
23/10/2024 NOC036
23/10/2024 NOC035
7/10/2024 NOC034
9/07/2024 NOC033
30/08/2023 NOC031
23/03/2023 NOC029
1/12/2022 NOC027
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.