Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


I Am Hope Foundation
CC44260
9429043191130
Registered

Registration details

19/05/2010
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Nutters Club NZ Charitable Trust 20/05/2010
The Key to Life Charitable Trust 28/05/2012
I Am Hope Foundation 26/05/2023

Address for service

PO Box 10271
Dominion Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1446

Charity's other details

https://www.facebook.com/iamhopenz/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To forever change the way New Zealanders think, act and feel about mental health and suicide. Our goal is to work seamlessly with mental health professionals, service providers, astute business leaders, and our communities to reverse the continuing increase in suicide and depressive illness through the implementation of positive social change.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Key to Life Charitable Trust is incorporated as a board under the Charitable Trust Act 1957 and is registered as a Charitable entity under the Charities Act 2005. The Trust has a General Manager / Ambassador who oversees the general operation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 18/10/2024 10/11/2024 $7,176,038 $8,575,559 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/04/2024 29/04/2024 $9,684,293 $7,258,651 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/11/2022 30/11/2022 $7,445,525 $3,486,161 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/11/2021 30/11/2021 $2,182,798 $2,180,438 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 16/09/2020 $2,942,862 $2,739,477 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $1,189,167 $590,658 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $591,054 $527,409 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 29/12/2017 $373,385 $330,072 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 10/09/2016 $155,678 $176,195 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Roger Hatrick-Smith Chairman 7/04/2025
Carlyn Topp Trustee 9/12/2024
Ronnie Moore Trustee 23/09/2024
Troy Jonathan Elliot Trustee 15/04/2024
Anita Yugovich Charity Secretary 12/02/2024

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dame Denise Ann L'Estrange-Corbett Trustee 21/08/2024
Naomi Ballantyne Trustee 9/08/2024
Todd Muller Trustee 9/08/2024
Troy Elliot Trustee 14/04/2024
Troy Elliot Trustee 14/04/2024
Ronald Albert Tumaitua Moore Trustee 21/02/2024
Jeanette Michelle Cogger Secretary 12/02/2024
Sir Ian Tayor Trustee 5/12/2023
Nicholas John Sharp Trustee 6/07/2023
Shane Eric Webby Trustee/Chair 30/06/2023
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/04/2025 NOC059
3/09/2024 NOC057
25/06/2024 NOC056
18/06/2024 NOC055
6/06/2024 NOC054
31/05/2024 NOC053
21/05/2024 NOC052
22/02/2024 NOC050
22/02/2024 NOC049
18/12/2023 NOC047
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.