Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


RE:ACT Charitable Trust
CC44958
9429043256990
Registered

Registration details

17/08/2010
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Youth With A Mission (YWAM) Tumanako 18/08/2010
Mission Adventures (Youth With A Mission) NZ 22/08/2011
re:ACT Charitable Trust 27/06/2014
RE:ACT Charitable Trust 19/02/2018

Address for service

1534 Cambridge Road
Te Awamutu
3800

Charity's other details


Oceania

Vanuatu

Asia

Cambodia


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide assistance to marginalised people and communities, and education to New Zealanders in the areas of sustainability and ethics

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides education to New Zealanders in the areas of sustainability and ethics)

Community development

Education / training / research, Employment, International activities

General public

Marginalised people and communities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2011.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 2/09/2024 $59,204 $58,059 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/09/2023 $9,499 $10,429 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $12,431 $11,420 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $8,070 $11,420 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $7,927 $5,605 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 23/09/2019 $6,684 $5,580 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 25/09/2018 $60,068 $46,440 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/08/2017 $40,684 $49,943 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $84,829 $84,406 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joshua Kineti Palliser Trustee 1/06/2023
Erica Jan Gadsby Trustee 1/10/2020
Wade Anthony Gadsby Trustee 20/03/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lance Revel Somervell Trustee 17/01/2023
David Alexander de Graaf Trustee 17/12/2019
Christopher Gadsby Trustee 19/05/2017
Erica Jan Gadsby Trustee 14/07/2016
Patrick Dodson Trustee 16/12/2014
Lloyd John Rankin Trustee 22/06/2011
Amanda Jane Hudson Trustee 8/04/2011
Joanne Desiree Smith Trustee 31/03/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/08/2023 NOC026
12/03/2023 NOC025
17/01/2023 NOC024
11/01/2021 NOC021
25/07/2020 NOC019
17/12/2019 NOC018
1/03/2019 NOC016
19/02/2018 NOC014
16/12/2014 NOC011
21/11/2014 NOC010
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.